EP0348164 - Sealing arrangement for a rotatable drum in a vat [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.12.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY 200 Chestnut Ridge Road Woodcliff Lake, New Jersey 07675-8738 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states INGERSOLL-RAND COMPANY 200 Chestnut Ridge Road Woodcliff Lake New Jersey 07675-8738 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bardsley, Donald E. 42 Marie Avenue Nashua New Hampshire 03063 / US | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Lightfoot, Robert Oscar, et al Raworth, Moss & Cook 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey, CR0 2EF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Lightfoot, Robert Oscar, et al Raworth, Moss & Cook 36 Sydenham Road Croydon Surrey, CR0 2EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306249.7 | 20.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | US19880209597 | 22.06.1988 Original published format: US 209597 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348164 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348164 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348164 | Date: | 09.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/06] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16J15/34, F16J15/46, B01D33/067 | [1991/10] | CPC: |
F16J15/46 (EP,US);
B01D33/073 (EP,US);
B01D33/801 (EP,US);
F16J15/344 (EP,US);
B01D2201/34 (EP,US);
Y10S277/903 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1989/52] | F16J15/46 | Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Dichtungseinrichtung für eine in einer Wanne drehbaren Trommel | [1989/52] | English: | Sealing arrangement for a rotatable drum in a vat | [1989/52] | French: | Dispositif d'étanchéité pour un tambour rotatif se trouvant dans une cuve | [1989/52] | Examination procedure | 20.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 14.04.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 16.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 30.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB625898 (DUNLOP RUBBER CO, et al); | [Y]US2894635 (IRTHUM HAROLD J, et al); | [A]FR1365269 (UNITED STATES STEEL CORP); | [Y]US4394021 (MERILAE JOUNI A [SE]) |