EP0348186 - Bandwidth reduction system for television [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.12.1994 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.12.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 08.02.1995 [1995/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH BROADCASTING CORPORATION Broadcasting House London W1A 1AA / GB | [1989/52] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Thomas Graham A. c/o BBC Research Department Kingswood Warren Tadworth Surrey KT20 6NP / GB | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Abnett, Richard Charles, et al Reddie & Grose 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Abnett, Richard Charles, et al REDDIE & GROSE 16 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306280.2 | 22.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | GB19880014822 | 22.06.1988 Original published format: GB 8814822 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348186 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348186 | Date: | 12.02.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.12.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H04N7/00 | [1989/52] | CPC: |
H04N7/0157 (EP);
H04N11/02 (EP);
H04N7/125 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | System zur Reduktion der Bandbreite für das Fernsehen | [1989/52] | English: | Bandwidth reduction system for television | [1989/52] | French: | Système de réduction de largeur de bande pour la télévision | [1989/52] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 28.03.1990 | Examination requested [1990/22] | 01.02.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 12.08.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/06] | 12.09.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1995/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]WO8705770 ; | [AD]WO8705769 | [AD] - BBC RESEARCH DEPARTMENT REPORT. no. 11, September 1987, TADWORTH GB pages 1 - 20; G. THOMAS ET AL: 'TELEVISION MOTION MEASUREMENT FOR DATV AND OTHER APPLICATIONS' | [A] - PROCEEDINGS OF THE SECOND INTERNATIONAL WORKSHOPON SIGNAL PROCESSING OF HDTV,29FEBRUARY-2MARCH 1988,L¡AQUILA(IT),CSELT,TORINO(IT) 'HAGHIRI ET AL:"MOTION COMPENSATED INTERPOLATION APPLIED TO HD-MAC PICTURES ENCODING AND DECODING" PAGES 375-381' |