EP0353849 - A signal receiving method for a user's device in a global positioning system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.06.1994 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 25.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.08.1994 [1994/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 101 / JP | For all designated states Hitachi Engineering Co., Ltd. 2-1, Saiwai-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6, Kanda Surugadai 4-chome Chiyoda-ku, Tokyo 101 / JP | ||
For all designated states Hitachi Engineering Co., Ltd. 2-1, Saiwai-cho 3-chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 317 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kuroda, Hiroshi 20-1, Mizuki-cho 2-Chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 316 / JP | 02 /
Watanabe, Atsushi 25-3-202, Kuji-cho 6-Chome Hitachi-shi Ibaraki 319-12 / JP | [1990/06] | Representative(s) | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al Ladas & Parry Dachauerstrasse 37 80335 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/06] | Molyneaux, Martyn William, et al c/o Ladas & Parry, Altheimer Eck 2 D-80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 89306293.5 | 22.06.1989 | [1990/06] | Priority number, date | JP19880152215 | 22.06.1988 Original published format: JP 15221588 | [1990/06] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0353849 | Date: | 07.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0353849 | Date: | 25.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G01S5/14 | [1990/06] | CPC: |
G01S19/28 (EP,US);
G01S19/426 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR [1990/06] | Title | German: | Signal-Empfangsverfahren für ein Verbrauchergerät in einem GPS-Ortungssystem | [1990/06] | English: | A signal receiving method for a user's device in a global positioning system | [1990/06] | French: | Procédé de réception d'un signal pour un appareil d'utilisateur dans un système GPS | [1990/06] | Examination procedure | 17.07.1989 | Examination requested [1990/06] | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.01.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 11.02.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 11.02.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 26.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.04.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP63138284 ; | [A]JP62276477 ; | [AP]JP63127172 ; | [A]JP61284687 ; | [A]JP62298787 ; | [A]JP61028881 ; | [A]EP0166300 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 396 (P-774), 21st October 1988; & JP-A-63 138 284 (NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD) 10-06-1988, & JP63138284 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 163 (P-703), 18th May 1988; & JP-A-62 276 477 (NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD) 01-12-1987, & JP62276477 A 00000000 | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 380 (P-769), 12th October 1988; & JP-A-63 127 172 (NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD) 31-05-1988, & JP63127172 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 147 (P-575), 14th May 1987; & JP-A-61 284 687 (JAPAN RADIO CO. LTD) 15-12-1986, & JP61284687 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 192 (P-712), 4th June 1988; & JP-A-62 298 787 (NISSAN MOTOR CO. LTD) 25-12-1987, & JP62298787 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 10, no. 180 (P-471), 24th June 1986; & JP-A-61 028 881 (SONY CORP.) 08-02-1986, & JP61028881 A 00000000 |