EP0348229 - Touch screen overlay with improved conductor durability [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states E. I. du Pont de Nemours and Company 1007 Market Street Wilmington, DE 19898 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | For all designated states E.I. DU PONT DE NEMOURS AND COMPANY 1007 Market Street Wilmington Delaware 19898 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Jackson, Scott Christopher 505 Beechwood Drive Kennett Square Pennsylvania 19348 / US | [1989/52] | Representative(s) | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al Brookes Batchellor 102-108 Clerkenwell Road London EC1M 5SA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1989/52] | Barnard, Eric Edward, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306403.0 | 23.06.1989 | [1989/52] | Priority number, date | US19880210961 | 24.06.1988 Original published format: US 210961 | [1989/52] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0348229 | Date: | 27.12.1989 | Language: | EN | [1989/52] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0348229 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0348229 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G06K11/06, G06K11/10 | [1994/14] | CPC: |
G06F3/047 (EP,US);
G06K11/06 (KR)
|
Former IPC [1989/52] | G06K11/06 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1989/52] | Title | German: | Berührungsanzeigeanlage mit verbesserter Leiterlebensdauer | [1989/52] | English: | Touch screen overlay with improved conductor durability | [1989/52] | French: | Surface tactile recouvrant un écran avec amélioration de la durée de la vie des conducteurs | [1989/52] | Examination procedure | 13.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 24.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 16.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 10.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 18.05.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 06.04.1994 | BE | 06.04.1994 | CH | 06.04.1994 | ES | 06.04.1994 | IT | 06.04.1994 | LI | 06.04.1994 | NL | 06.04.1994 | SE | 06.04.1994 | LU | 30.06.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2002/23] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
IT | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
SE | 06.04.1994 | ||
LU | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [2000/06] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
IT | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
LU | 30.06.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
IT | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
NL | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/11] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
BE | 06.04.1994 | ||
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1995/02] | AT | 06.04.1994 | |
CH | 06.04.1994 | ||
LI | 06.04.1994 | ||
Former [1994/48] | CH | 06.04.1994 | |
LI | 06.04.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]EP0145651 (BATTELLE MEMORIAL INSTITUTE [CH]); | [AD]US4696860 (EPPERSON DAVID L [US]) |