EP0350201 - Timing valve for manually selected gears of an automatic transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.06.1993 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.06.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.08.1993 [1993/31] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | For:FR
FORD FRANCE S.A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood Essex / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Arisumi, Lloyd 2401 Placid Way Ann Arbor Michigan 48105 / US | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306575.5 | 28.06.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | US19880215161 | 05.07.1988 Original published format: US 215161 | [1990/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0350201 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0350201 | Date: | 02.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | F16H61/08 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
F16H61/08 (EP,US);
F16H61/068 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/02] | Title | German: | Zeitsteuerventil für willkürlich ausgewählte Gänge eines automatischen Getriebes | [1990/02] | English: | Timing valve for manually selected gears of an automatic transmission | [1990/02] | French: | Soupape à commande d'ordre chronologique pour les vitesses sélectées manuellement d'une transmission automatique | [1990/02] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 04.09.1990 | Examination requested [1990/44] | 30.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 11.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/31] | 10.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.05.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2029522 (NISSAN MOTOR); | [AD]US3706240 (BORNEMAN KARL J, et al); | [A]DE2056272 ; | [A]DE2203501 (FORD WERKE AG); | [A]US4744269 (GREENE THOMAS L [US], et al) |