EP0349328 - Self-adjusting oscilloscope [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 29.01.1992 Database last updated on 05.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.08.1992 | Change - applicant | published on 30.09.1992 [1992/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TEKTRONIX INC. Howard Vollum Park 14150 S.W. Karl Braun Drive P.O.Box 500, Mail Stop 50-PAT Beaverton Oregon 97077-0001 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/40] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX INC. Howard Vollum Park 14150 S.W. Karl Braun Drive P.O.Box 500, Mail Stop 50-PAT Beaverton Oregon 97077-0001 / US | ||
Former [1990/01] | For all designated states TEKTRONIX, INC. Wilsonville Industrial Park, 26600 S.W. Parkway Avenue Wilsonville, Oregon 97070-1000 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chao, Peter S. 7300 S.W. 171st Drive Aloha Oregon 97007 / US | 02 /
Tilden, Mark D. 4880 S.W. 192nd Aloha Oregon 97007 / US | [1990/01] | Representative(s) | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/01] | Burke, Steven David, et al R.G.C. Jenkins & Co. 26 Caxton Street London SW1H 0RJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306633.2 | 29.06.1989 | [1990/01] | Priority number, date | US19880213806 | 30.06.1988 Original published format: US 213806 | [1990/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0349328 | Date: | 03.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0349328 | Date: | 16.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01R13/34, G01R13/22, G01R13/32, G01R35/00 | [1991/09] | CPC: |
G01R13/32 (EP);
G01R13/345 (EP);
G01R35/002 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/01] | G01R13/34, G01R35/00 | Designated contracting states | CH, DE, FR, GB, LI, NL [1990/01] | Title | German: | Selbstkalibrierendes Oszilloskop | [1990/01] | English: | Self-adjusting oscilloscope | [1990/01] | French: | Oscilloscope à calibrage automatique | [1990/01] | File destroyed: | 15.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 17.07.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/12] | 21.10.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/12] | Fees paid | Penalty fee | Penalty fee Rule 85b EPC 1973 | 21.08.1991 | M01   Not yet paid | Additional fee for renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | 03   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4743844 ; | [Y]US4162531 ; | [A]US4121164 | [A] - JOURNAL OF ELECTRONIC ENGINEERING, vol. 25, no. 257, May 1988, pages 34-36, TokyoJP; S. SUZUKI: "Intelligent functions increase efficiency of analog oscilloscope" |