EP0350276 - Temporary wet strength resins with nitrogen heterocyclic nonnucleophilic functionalities and paper products containing same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.03.1995 [1995/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, OH 45202 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/02] | For all designated states THE PROCTER & GAMBLE COMPANY One Procter & Gamble Plaza Cincinnati, Ohio 45202 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bjorkquist, David W. 36 Oliver Road Wyoming Ohio 45215 / US | [1990/02] | Representative(s) | Bottema, Johan Jan, et al Procter & Gamble Service GmbH IP Department Sulzbacher Straße 40-50 65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/02] | Bottema, Johan Jan, et al Procter & Gamble GmbH Patent Department Sulzbacher Strasse 40-50 D-65824 Schwalbach am Taunus / DE | ||
Former [1990/02] | Gibson, Tony Nicholas Procter & Gamble (NTC) Limited Whitley Road Longbenton Newcastle upon Tyne NE12 9TS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89306799.1 | 04.07.1989 | [1990/02] | Priority number, date | US19880215087 | 05.07.1988 Original published format: US 215087 | US19890343777 | 26.04.1989 Original published format: US 343777 | [1990/02] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0350276 | Date: | 10.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/02] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0350276 | Date: | 10.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0350276 | Date: | 06.04.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 17.05.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08F226/06, C08F246/00, C08F216/34, A61L15/00 | [1990/02] | CPC: |
A61L15/62 (EP,US);
C08F226/00 (EP,US);
C08F246/00 (EP,US);
D21H17/455 (EP,US);
D21H21/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/02] | Title | German: | Zeitweilig nassfeste Harze mit stickstoffartigen heterocyclischen nichtnucleophilen Funktionalitäten und diese enthaltende Papierprodukte | [1990/02] | English: | Temporary wet strength resins with nitrogen heterocyclic nonnucleophilic functionalities and paper products containing same | [1990/02] | French: | Résines à résistance temporaire en condition mouillée avec des fonctionnalités hétérocycliques azote non nucléophiles et produits en papier les contenant | [1990/02] | Examination procedure | 20.12.1991 | Examination requested [1992/09] | 15.06.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 04.10.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 08.10.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.01.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.01.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US3410828 (KEKISH GEORGE T); | [A]GB1410235 (GAF CORP) |