EP0352044 - Transistor base current compensation circuitry [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.10.1995 Database last updated on 02.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 06.12.1995 [1995/49] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | For all designated states GENERAL ELECTRIC COMPANY 1 River Road Schenectady, NY 12345 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schade, Otto Heinrich, Jr. 12 Soder Road North Caldwell New Jersey 07006 / US | [1990/04] | Representative(s) | Meddle, Alan L., et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT, Pettenkoferstrasse 20-22 80336 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1994/50] | Meddle, Alan Leonard, et al FORRESTER & BOEHMERT Franz-Joseph-Strasse 38 D-80801 München / DE | ||
Former [1992/14] | Pratt, Richard Wilson London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | ||
Former [1990/04] | Smith, Thomas Ian Macdonald London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Burdett House 15-16 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6DU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307217.3 | 17.07.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | US19880220712 | 18.07.1988 Original published format: US 220712 | [1990/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0352044 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0352044 | Date: | 14.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/50] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.11.1989 | Classification | IPC: | G05F3/30, G05F3/28 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
G05F3/30 (EP,US);
G05F3/265 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/04] | Title | German: | Kompensierungsstromkreis für Transistorbasisstrom | [1990/04] | English: | Transistor base current compensation circuitry | [1990/04] | French: | Circuit de compensation pour le courant de base d'un transistor | [1990/04] | Examination procedure | 02.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 22.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 22.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.12.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.06.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.09.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 12.09.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 15.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/49] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | NL | 14.12.1994 | [1995/35] | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6091425 ; | [A]JP61226816 ; | [A]US4325017 (SCHADE JR OTTO H); | [A]US4284945 (AHMED ADEL A A); | [A]EP0188401 (CENTRE ELECTRON HORLOGER [CH]); | [A]US4282477 (AHMED ADEL A A); | [A]US4590419 (MORIARTY JR JOHN K [US]) | [A] - IEE EUROPAEN SOLID-STATE CIRCUITS CONFERENCE September 1975, LONDON, GB pages 40 - 42; G.C.M MEIJER: "AN INTEGRATED BANDGAP-REFERENCE" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 239 (P-391)(1962) 25 September 1985, & JP-A-60 91425 (SHARP K.K) 22 May 1985,, & JP6091425 A 19850522 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 11, no. 62 (P-551)(2509) 25 February 1987, & JP-A-61 226816 (TOSHIBA CORP) 8 October 1986,, & JP61226816 A 19861008 |