EP0352070 - Improved multifunctional viscosity index improver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.08.1993 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 13.10.1993 [1993/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 200 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | For all designated states EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC. 200 Park Avenue Florham Park New Jersey 07932 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chung, David Yen Lung 21 Keen Lane Edison, NJ 08820 / US | 02 /
Johnston, John Eric 639 Dorian Road Westfield, NJ 07090 / US | [1992/43] |
Former [1990/04] | 01 /
Chung, David Yen Lung 21 Keen Lane Edison New Jersey 08820 / US | ||
02 /
Johnston, John Eric 639 Dorian Road Westfield New Jersey 07090 / US | Representative(s) | Northover, Robert Frank, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre P.O. Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire OX13 6BB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/04] | Northover, Robert Frank, et al Exxon Chemical Limited Exxon Chemical Technology Centre PO Box 1 Abingdon Oxfordshire, OX13 6BB / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307272.8 | 18.07.1989 | [1990/04] | Priority number, date | US19880220310 | 18.07.1988 Original published format: US 220310 | [1990/04] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0352070 | Date: | 24.01.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/04] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0352070 | Date: | 21.10.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1989 | Classification | IPC: | C10M143/02, C10M145/10, C10M149/06, C10L1/18, C10L1/22, C08F255/02, // (C10M143/02, 143:00),(C10M145/10, 143:02, 143:00),(C10M149/06, 143:02, 143:00), C10N30:02, C10N30:04, C10N60:00 | [1990/04] | CPC: |
C10L1/196 (EP,US);
C10L1/2364 (EP,US);
C10M143/00 (EP,US);
C10M143/02 (EP,US);
C10M145/10 (EP,US);
C10M149/06 (EP,US);
C10M2205/00 (EP,US);
C10M2205/02 (EP,US);
C10M2205/022 (EP,US);
C10M2207/283 (EP,US);
C10M2207/289 (EP,US);
C10M2209/08 (EP,US);
C10M2209/082 (EP,US);
C10M2209/084 (EP,US);
C10M2209/086 (EP,US);
C10M2215/04 (EP,US);
C10M2215/042 (EP,US);
C10M2215/08 (EP,US);
C10M2215/082 (EP,US);
C10M2215/086 (EP,US);
C10M2215/22 (EP,US);
C10M2215/221 (EP,US);
C10M2215/225 (EP,US);
C10M2215/226 (EP,US);
C10M2215/26 (EP,US);
C10M2215/28 (EP,US);
C10M2215/30 (EP,US);
C10M2217/023 (EP,US);
C10M2217/024 (EP,US);
C10M2217/046 (EP,US);
C10M2217/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/04 (EP,US);
C10N2040/042 (EP,US);
C10N2040/044 (EP,US);
C10N2040/046 (EP,US);
C10N2040/06 (EP,US);
C10N2040/08 (EP,US);
C10N2040/25 (EP,US);
C10N2040/251 (EP,US);
C10N2040/252 (EP,US);
C10N2040/253 (EP,US);
C10N2040/255 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/04] | Title | German: | Multifunktionaler Viskositätsindexverbesserer | [1992/43] | English: | Improved multifunctional viscosity index improver | [1990/04] | French: | Agent multifonctionnel modifié modifiant l'indice de viscosité | [1990/04] |
Former [1990/04] | Multifunktionale Viskositätsindexverbesserer | Examination procedure | 08.08.1989 | Examination requested [1990/04] | 20.12.1990 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.06.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 20.08.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.04.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.04.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 22.07.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/41] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [YD]US4234435 (MEINHARDT NORMAN A, et al); | [YD]US4517104 (BLOCH RICARDO [US], et al); | [Y]EP0264247 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) |