EP0361650 - Green light emitting phosphor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 21.08.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SAMSUNG ELECTRON DEVICES CO., LTD. 575, Shin-ri, Taean-eub Hwaseong-gun, Kyunggi-do / KR | [1990/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Yang, Jun-mo 81, Koong-ri Goduk-myeon Pyongtaek-gun Kyunggi-do / KR | 02 /
Kim, Woo-chan 493-19, Kwangan 1-dong Nam-gu Pusan / KR | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. St Bride's House 10 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8JD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Holmes, Michael John, et al Frank B. Dehn & Co. Imperial House 15-19 Kingsway London WC2B 6UZ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307300.7 | 19.07.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | KR19880012624 | 29.09.1988 Original published format: KR 8812624 | KR19880012626 | 29.09.1988 Original published format: KR 8812626 | KR19880015344 | 22.11.1988 Original published format: KR 8815344 | KR19880017344 | 23.12.1988 Original published format: KR 8817344 | KR19880017527 | 26.12.1988 Original published format: KR 8817527 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0361650 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0361650 | Date: | 06.02.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/06] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361650 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C09K11/84, C09K11/64, H01J29/20 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
C09K11/642 (EP);
C09K11/7702 (EP);
C09K11/7717 (EP);
C09K11/773 (EP);
C09K11/7745 (EP);
C09K11/7767 (EP);
C09K11/7785 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/14] | Title | German: | Grünlicht emittierendes Phosphor | [1990/14] | English: | Green light emitting phosphor | [1990/14] | French: | Matériau luminescent émettant une lumière verte | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 14.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 15.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 26.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 13.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP57126045 ; | [X]JP56042942 ; | [X]JP57174832 ; | [A]JP63254659 ; | [X]DE2856053 | [X] - JAPANESE PATENT OFFICE, TOKYO, JAPAN, FILE SUPPLIER JAPS; & JP-A-57 126 045 (MITSUBISHI DENKI K.K.), & JP57126045 A 00000000 | [X] - JAPANESE PATENT OFFICE, TOKYO, JAPAN, FILE SUPPLIER JAPS; & JP-A-56 042 942 (TOSHIBA CORP.), & JP56042942 A 00000000 | [X] - JAPANESE PATENT OFFICE, TOKYO, JAPAN, FILE SUPPLIER JAPS; & JP-A-57 174 832 (TOKYO SHIBAURA DENKI K.K.), & JP57174832 A 00000000 | [A] - JAPANESE PATENT OFFICE, TOKYO, JAPAN, FILE SUPPLIER JAPS; & JP-A-63 254 659 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP.), & JP63254659 A 00000000 |