EP0356021 - A method for the amplification of nucleotide sequences [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 15.11.1996 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 02.01.1997 [1997/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Zeneca Limited 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/48] | For all designated states ZENECA LIMITED 15 Stanhope Gate London W1Y 6LN / GB | ||
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states IMPERIAL CHEMICAL INDUSTRIES PLC Imperial Chemical House, Millbank London SW1P 3JF / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Markham, Alexander Fred 25 Booth Bed Lane Goostrey Crewe Cheshire / GB | 02 /
Smith, John Craig 14 Ascol Drive Plumley Nr Knutsford Cheshire / GB | 03 /
Anwar, Rashida 34, Shelley Avenue Wincham Northwich Cheshire / GB | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Mayall, John, et al Avecia Limited Intellectual Property Group P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House, Blackley, Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1996/18] | Mayall, John, et al Intellectual Property Group Zeneca Specialties P.O. Box 42 Hexagon House Blackley Manchester M9 8ZS / GB | ||
Former [1990/09] | Mack, John Richard, et al ICI Group Patents Services Dept. PO Box 6 Shire Park Bessemer Road Welwyn Garden City Herts, AL7 1HD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89307672.9 | 27.07.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | GB19880018020 | 28.07.1988 Original published format: GB 8818020 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356021 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356021 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, // C07H21/00 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
C12Q1/6876 (EP);
C12N15/00 (KR);
C07H21/00 (EP);
C08G77/42 (KR);
C12Q1/683 (EP);
C12Q1/6855 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Amplifikation von Nucleotidsequenzen | [1990/09] | English: | A method for the amplification of nucleotide sequences | [1990/09] | French: | Procédé pour l'amplification de séquences nucléotidiques | [1990/09] | File destroyed: | 20.04.2002 | Examination procedure | 06.02.1992 | Examination requested [1992/14] | 09.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 09.03.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.01.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.09.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 22.05.1996 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1997/01] | 01.08.1996 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1997/01] | Request for further processing for: | 13.01.1995 | Request for further processing filed | 13.01.1995 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.01.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.06.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.06.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.06.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 11.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.1996 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0200362 |