EP0356067 - Weighing vehicles [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 23.07.1993 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.07.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 15.09.1993 [1993/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kirby, John 364a Manchester Old Road Middleton Manchester M24 4EB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states Kirby, John 364a Manchester Old Road Middleton Manchester M24 4EB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | McNeight, David Leslie, et al Marks & Clerk LLP Sussex House 83-85 Mosley Street Manchester M2 3LG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | McNeight, David Leslie, et al McNeight & Lawrence Regent House Heaton Lane Stockport Cheshire SK4 1BS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308093.7 | 09.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | GB19880019937 | 23.08.1988 Original published format: GB 8819937 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356067 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356067 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01G19/03, G01G19/12, G01G19/02, G01G9/00 | [1990/32] | CPC: |
E02F9/26 (EP);
G01G19/03 (EP);
G01G19/12 (EP);
G01L3/242 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/09] | G01G19/02, G01G9/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Wiegen von Fahrzeugen | [1990/09] | English: | Weighing vehicles | [1990/09] | French: | Pesage de véhicules | [1990/09] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 21.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/17] | 28.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.12.1992 | Request for decision received: (all rights) | 12.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.03.1993 | Result of request for decision ((all rights)): Request granted | 19.04.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/37] | 29.04.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.1992 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   16.12.1992 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP5970919 ; | [X]EP0111636 ; | [X]GB2162955 ; | [XP]EP0285689 ; | [X]EP0082663 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 175 (P-294)[1612], 11th August 1984; & JP-A-59 70 919 (KIYATAPIRAA MITSUBISHI K.K.) 21-04-1984, & JP5970919 A 00000000 |