EP0361660 - Sheet metal article [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 13.09.1993 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 03.11.1993 [1993/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GOSPEL RESOURCE LIMITED 8 Horne Street Thomastown Victoria 3074 / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states GOSPEL RESOURCE LIMITED 8 Horne Street Thomastown Victoria 3074 / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Barker, Victor Graham "Whinfell" Black Range Road Romsey Victoria / AU | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Nash Matthews LLP 24 Hills Road Cambridge CB2 1JP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Matthews, Heather Clare, et al Keith W Nash & Co Pearl Assurance House 90-92 Regent Street Cambridge CB2 1DP / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308153.9 | 10.08.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | AU19880000672 | 29.09.1988 Original published format: AU 67288 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0361660 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0361660 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B21D31/04, B21D53/38 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
B21D31/04 (EP,KR,US);
B21B47/00 (KR);
B21D53/38 (EP,US);
E04D3/362 (EP,US);
Y10T29/18 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12361 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/14] | Title | German: | Blechartikel | [1990/14] | English: | Sheet metal article | [1990/14] | French: | Article en tôle | [1990/14] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 24.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/35] | 09.03.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.08.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 03.11.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/44] | 03.06.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.06.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB2078276 (EXPANDED METAL); | [A]EP0277425 (SILENT CHANNEL PROD LTD [GB]) |