EP0356187 - Electrophoresis using contour-clamped electric fields [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 09.02.2001 Database last updated on 02.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.02.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 28.03.2001 [2001/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Stanford University Stanford, California 94305 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states THE BOARD OF TRUSTEES OF THE LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR UNIVERSITY Stanford University Stanford California 94305 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Chu, Gilbert 3416 Cork Oak Way Palo Alto California 94303 / US | 02 /
Vollrath, Douglas 98 Church Street, Apt. 1 Mountain View California 94041 / US | 03 /
Davis, Ron 433 Kingsley Palo Alto California 94301 / US | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Harrison, David Christopher, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/09] | Harrison, David Christopher, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308464.0 | 21.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | US19880235296 | 23.08.1988 Original published format: US 235296 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356187 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356187 | Date: | 09.10.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356187 | Date: | 12.04.2000 | Language: | EN | [2000/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.08.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G01N27/26 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
G01N27/44704 (EP,US);
G01N27/44713 (EP,US);
G01N27/44773 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [2000/04] |
Former [1990/09] | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE | Title | German: | Elektrophorese unter Verwendung elektrischer Felder einer vorgegebenen Kontur | [1999/17] | English: | Electrophoresis using contour-clamped electric fields | [1990/09] | French: | Electrophorèse utilisant des champs électriques à contour imposé | [1990/09] |
Former [1990/09] | Elektroforese mit Verwendung elektrischer Felder mit vorgegebener Kontur | Examination procedure | 16.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/03] | 09.02.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.08.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.06.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.12.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 08.01.1998 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.03.1999 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 08.10.1999 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.12.1999 | Fee for grant paid | 31.12.1999 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.01.2001 | No opposition filed within time limit [2001/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.07.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 17.07.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.07.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.07.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 04.08.1999 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4315812 (KARLSON ESKIL L); | [AD]WO8402001 (UNIV COLUMBIA [US]); | [AD]EP0256737 (UNIV LELAND STANFORD JUNIOR [US]); | [AP]EP0307332 (ARI SA [FR]) |