EP0360428 - Motor vehicle fuel vapour emission control assembly [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.04.1993 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.04.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 09.06.1993 [1993/23] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:FR
FORD FRANCE S.A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | |||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oslapas, Algis George 6904 Lafayette Dearborn Height Michigan 48127 / US | [1990/13] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/13] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308632.2 | 24.08.1989 | [1990/13] | Priority number, date | US19880247182 | 21.09.1988 Original published format: US 247182 | [1990/13] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0360428 | Date: | 28.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/13] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0360428 | Date: | 01.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0360428 | Date: | 17.06.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02M25/08 | [1990/13] | CPC: |
F02M25/0854 (EP,US);
B60K15/03504 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/13] | Title | German: | Regeleinrichtung für die Abgabe von Benzindämpfen bei einem Motorfahrzeug | [1990/13] | English: | Motor vehicle fuel vapour emission control assembly | [1990/13] | French: | Dispositif de contrôle de l'émission des vapeurs du carburant d'un véhicule motorisé | [1990/13] | Examination procedure | 21.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 08.04.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.07.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.09.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 13.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 23.12.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.01.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 21.01.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.03.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]US4793839 (HAYASHIDA TSUTOMU [JP], et al); | [XP]US4787643 (SHIRATA TOMONORI [JP]); | [YD]US4454849 (MIZUNO JUNZI [JP], et al); | [Y]EP0067602 (TOYOTA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]US3933130 (CSICSERY SIGMUND M); | [A]US4300511 (LANG JEROME G) |