EP0356257 - Processes for the lyophilization of cells including lyophilization media, and methods of reconstituting lyophilized cells [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.02.1996 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.01.2003 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): NL | published on 12.03.2003 [2003/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cobe Laboratories, Inc. 1185 Oak Street Lakewood CO 80215-4407 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/04] | For all designated states COBE LABORATORIES, INC. 1185 Oak Street Lakewood CO 80215-4407 / US | ||
Former [1990/09] | For all designated states CRYOPHARM CORPORATION 2585 Nina Street Pasadena California 91107 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goodrich, Raymond Paul 171 North Wilson NO. 201 Pasadena California 91106 / US | 02 /
Williams, Christine Marie 1115 Cordova Street No. 313 Pasadena California 91106 / US | [1990/09] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/35] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | ||
Former [1990/09] | Bizley, Richard Edward BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308672.8 | 25.08.1989 | [1990/09] | Priority number, date | US19880237583 | 26.08.1988 Original published format: US 237583 | US19890378349 | 11.07.1989 Original published format: US 378349 | [1990/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0356257 | Date: | 28.02.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0356257 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0356257 | Date: | 29.03.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A01N1/02, A61K35/18 | [1990/09] | CPC: |
A01N1/0221 (EP,US);
A01N1/02 (EP,US);
A01N1/0205 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/09] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Lyophilisierung von Zellen Lyophilisierungsmedien und Verfahren zur Wiederherstellung von lyophilisierten Zellen. | [1995/13] | English: | Processes for the lyophilization of cells including lyophilization media, and methods of reconstituting lyophilized cells | [1990/09] | French: | Procédés de lyophilisation de cellules, y compris les milieux de lyophilisation, et méthodes de reconstitution de cellules lyophilisées | [1990/09] |
Former [1990/09] | Verfahren zur Lyophilisierung von Lyophilisierungsmedien enthaltenden Zellen und Verfahren zur Wiederherstellung von lyophilisierten Zellen | Miscellaneous | EPB 1995/13: Teilanmeldung 92110201.8 eingereicht am 25/08/89 | EPB 1995/13: Divisional application 92110201.8 filed on 25/08/89 | EPB 1995/13: Demande divisionnaire 92110201.8 déposée le 25/08/89 | Examination procedure | 28.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 06.09.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.01.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 09.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 21.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 28.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.11.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 02.11.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP92110201.8 / EP0508496 | Opposition(s) | 30.12.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/12] | Request for further processing for: | 09.01.1993 | Request for further processing filed | 09.01.1993 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 01.02.1993 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.05.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 14.07.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.07.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 29.03.1995 | GR | 29.03.1995 | NL | 29.03.1995 | SE | 29.06.1995 | LU | 31.08.1995 | [2003/11] |
Former [2002/24] | ES | 29.03.1995 | |
GR | 29.03.1995 | ||
SE | 29.06.1995 | ||
LU | 31.08.1995 | ||
NL | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [2000/27] | GR | 29.03.1995 | |
SE | 29.06.1995 | ||
LU | 31.08.1995 | ||
NL | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | GR | 29.03.1995 | |
SE | 29.06.1995 | ||
LU | 31.08.1995 | ||
Former [1996/04] | SE | 29.06.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP60058827 ; | [A]JP57007419 ; | [A]DE2025718 ; | [X]US4243687 (KLINE LEO) | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 104, no. 19, 12th May 1986, page 333, abstract no. 164815m, Columbus, Ohio, US; & JP-A-60 058 827 (TAKEDA CHEMICAL IND. LTD) 21-12-1985, & JP60058827 A 00000000 | [Y] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 102, no. 5, 4th February 1985, page 370, abstract no. 43529w, Columbus, Ohio, US; V. PENEVA et al.: "Investigation of the influence of erythrocyte concentration and of the protective medium on the polarization phenomena in lyophilized erythrocytes", & DOKL. BOLG. AKAD. NAUK 1984, 37(6), 815-18 | [Y] - CRYOBIOLOGY, vol 8, no. 4, 1971, page 384; A.P. MacKENZIE et al.: "Freeze-drying preservation of human erythrocytes" | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 68 (C-100)[946], 30th April 1982; & JP-A-57 007 419 (TOUSHIBA KAGAKU KOGYO K.K.) 14-01-1982, & JP57007419 A 00000000 | Examination | US3344167 | EP0356258 |