EP0361686 - Manual transmission and gear rattle damper therefor [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.02.1994 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.02.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 23.03.1994 [1994/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states EATON CORPORATION Eaton Center, 1111 Superior Avenue Cleveland Ohio 44114 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goscenski, Edward John, Jr. 12276 Beadle Lake Road Battle Creek Michigan 49017 / US | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Schwan, Gerhard Schwan Schwan Schorer Patentanwälte Bauerstrasse 22 80796 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | Schwan, Gerhard, Dipl.-Ing. Elfenstrasse 32 D-81739 München / DE | ||
Former [1990/14] | Douglas, John Andrew Eaton House Staines Road Hounslow Middlesex TW4 5DX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308733.8 | 30.08.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | US19880250208 | 28.09.1988 Original published format: US 250208 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0361686 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361686 | Date: | 31.03.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F16H3/08, F16F15/16 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
F16H57/0025 (EP,US);
F16D1/06 (EP,US);
F16D23/06 (EP,US);
F16D35/00 (EP,US);
F16H3/091 (EP,US);
F16H57/0006 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/14] | Title | German: | Handbedienter Antrieb und Anordnung zur Dämpfung des darin auftretenden Klappergeräusches | [1990/14] | English: | Manual transmission and gear rattle damper therefor | [1990/14] | French: | Transmission manuelle et dispositif pour amortir le bruit de son engrènement | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 01.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/48] | 21.05.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 09.09.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.09.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 30.09.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.01.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.07.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.07.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2696124 (FLOWERS WILLIAM H, et al); | [Y]FR1344080 (SIEMENS AG); | [Y]GB1131290 (BORG WARNER); | [A]DE3516104 (GOETZE AG [DE]); | [YD]US4677868 (FILKINS TIMOTHY J [US]) |