EP0366240 - Prolonged activity nicotine patch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.01.2000 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.01.2000 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 08.03.2000 [2000/10] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pharmacia & Upjohn Aktiebolag 112 87 Stockholm / SE | [1996/52] |
Former [1995/40] | For all designated states Pharmacia AB S-171 97 Stockholm / SE | ||
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states PHARMETRIX CORPORATION 1360 Willow Road Menlo Park California 94025 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Baker, Richard W. 120 Kingsley Palo Alto California 94301 / US | 02 /
Kochinke, Frank 2637 Barrington Terrace Fremont California 94537 / US | 03 /
Huang, Carl 972 Embarcadero Road Palo Alto California 94303 / US | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/26] | Armitage, Ian Michael, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | ||
Former [1990/18] | Allard, Susan Joyce BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89308978.9 | 05.09.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | US19880264397 | 28.10.1988 Original published format: US 264397 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0366240 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0366240 | Date: | 17.03.1999 | Language: | EN | [1999/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61L15/44 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
A61K9/7053 (EP,US);
A61K31/465 (EP,US);
A61K9/7069 (EP,US);
A61K9/7084 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/18] | Title | German: | Nikotin-Pflaster mit verlängerter Wirkung | [1990/18] | English: | Prolonged activity nicotine patch | [1990/18] | French: | Pansement de nicotine à activité prolongée | [1990/18] | Examination procedure | 13.07.1990 | Examination requested [1990/36] | 27.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M09) | 22.08.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 29.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.06.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 29.12.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.09.1997 | Date of oral proceedings | 09.10.1997 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 09.10.1997 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 14.11.1997 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1998 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 17.09.1998 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.12.1998 | Fee for grant paid | 08.12.1998 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | EP98116736.4 / EP0916339 | Opposition(s) | 18.12.1999 | No opposition filed within time limit [2000/10] | Request for further processing for: | 29.08.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 29.08.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 16.01.1995 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 02.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.08.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.09.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 12.09.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.09.1997 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 09.09.1998 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP61251619 ; | [AD]DE3438284 (TILLY HANS HARALD VON); | [AD]EP0246385 (NEW MEXICO TECH RES FOUND [US]); | [Y]WO8801516 (LOHMANN GMBH & CO KG [DE]); | [YP]US4839174 (BAKER RICHARD W [US], et al) | [A] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, vol. 101, no. 13, 24th September 1984, page 211, abstract no. 10562k, Columbus, Ohio, US; J.E. ROSE et al.: "Transdermal administration of nicotine", & DRUG ALCOHOL DEPEND. 1984, 13(3), 209-13 | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 101 (C-413)[2548], 31st March 1987; & JP-A-61 251 619 (NITTO ELECTRIC IND. CO. LTD) 08-11-1986, & JP61251619 A 00000000 | Examination | WO8912470 |