EP0358521 - An exposure apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.04.1996 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 29.05.1996 [1996/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 3-30-2 Shimomaruko Ohta-ku Tokyo 146 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mizusawa, Nobutoshi 3-5-6-907 Nitshitsuruma Yamato-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 02 /
Ebinuma, Ryuichi 1-20-8-102 Mita Tama-ku Kawasaki-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | 03 /
Kariya, Takao 1-748-9 Hodokubo Hino-shi Tokyo / JP | 04 /
Uzawa, Shunichi 4-27-10 Nakamachi Setagaya-ku Tokyo / JP | 05 /
Shimoda, Isamu 93-1 Tatsunodai Zama-shi Kanagawa-ken / JP | [1990/11] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/11] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309117.3 | 08.09.1989 | [1990/11] | Priority number, date | JP19880224712 | 09.09.1988 Original published format: JP 22471288 | JP19880224713 | 09.09.1988 Original published format: JP 22471388 | [1990/11] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0358521 | Date: | 14.03.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/11] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0358521 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0358521 | Date: | 07.06.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03F7/20 | [1990/11] | CPC: |
G03F7/70066 (EP,US);
G03F7/702 (EP,US);
G03F7/70858 (EP,US);
G03F7/70875 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/11] | Title | German: | Belichtungsvorrichtung | [1990/11] | English: | An exposure apparatus | [1990/11] | French: | Appareil d'exposition | [1990/11] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 12.07.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 17.01.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.08.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 30.11.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.12.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.02.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 08.02.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.03.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/22] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6151824 ; | [A]JP6030132 ; | [A]EP0136672 (HITACHI LTD [JP]); | [A]EP0253283 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 213 (E-422)(2269) 25 July 1986, & JP-A-61 51824 (HITACHI LTD) 14 March 1986,, & JP6151824 A 19860314 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 150 (E-324)(1873) 25 June 1985, & JP-A-60 30132 (HITACHI SEISAKUSHO K.K.) 15 February 1985,, & JP6030132 A 19850215 |