EP0361747 - A sampled data phase locking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.12.1994 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 25.01.1995 [1995/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton, NJ 08540 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1992/26] | For all designated states RCA Thomson Licensing Corporation 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | ||
Former [1990/14] | For all designated states RCA LICENSING CORPORATION 2 Independence Way Princeton New Jersey 08540 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fling, Russell, Thomas 1369 Green Trails Drive Naperville, Illinois 60540 / US | [1990/14] | Representative(s) | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/14] | Pratt, Richard Wilson, et al London Patent Operation G.E. Technical Services Co. Inc. Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309413.6 | 15.09.1989 | [1990/14] | Priority number, date | US19880249022 | 26.09.1988 Original published format: US 249022 | US19890324875 | 17.03.1989 Original published format: US 324875 | [1990/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0361747 | Date: | 04.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/14] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0361747 | Date: | 12.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0361747 | Date: | 02.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N9/455 | [1990/14] | CPC: |
H04N9/455 (EP,US);
H03L7/00 (KR)
| Designated contracting states | AT, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/14] | Title | German: | System zur Phasenverriegelung abgetasteter Daten | [1990/14] | English: | A sampled data phase locking system | [1990/14] | French: | Système pour le verrouillage de phase des données échantillonnées | [1990/14] | Examination procedure | 17.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/08] | 10.08.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 02.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]US4491862 (FLAMM PETER M [DE]) |