EP0367394 - Flame trap [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1992 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.12.1999 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): GR | published on 26.01.2000 [2000/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states PYROBAN LMITED Endeavour Works Dolphin Road Shoreham-by-Sea West Sussex, BN4 6PB / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states PYROBAN LMITED Endeavour Works Dolphin Road Shoreham-by-Sea West Sussex, BN4 6PB / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Oliver, Geoffrey R. 34 Brook Barn Way Goring-by-Sea Worthing W. Sussex, BN12 4DW / GB | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Ashmead, Richard John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | Ashmead, Richard John, et al KILBURN & STRODE 30 John Street London, WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309449.0 | 18.09.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | GB19880025823 | 04.11.1988 Original published format: GB 8825823 | [1990/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0367394 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367394 | Date: | 07.08.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A62C4/02 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
A62C4/02 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/19] | Title | German: | Feuersperre | [1990/19] | English: | Flame trap | [1990/19] | French: | Dispositif pare-flamme | [1990/19] | Examination procedure | 10.04.1990 | Request for accelerated examination filed | 20.04.1990 | Examination requested [1990/25] | 03.08.1990 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 03.08.1990 | Decision about request for accelerated examination - accepted: Yes | 09.01.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 14.01.1991 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.02.1991 | Fee for grant paid | 20.02.1991 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 08.05.1992 | No opposition filed within time limit [1992/31] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.08.1991 | CH | 07.08.1991 | GR | 07.08.1991 | LI | 07.08.1991 | SE | 07.08.1991 | LU | 30.09.1991 | [2000/04] |
Former [1999/52] | AT | 07.08.1991 | |
CH | 07.08.1991 | ||
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
LU | 30.09.1991 | ||
Former [1992/15] | AT | 07.08.1991 | |
CH | 07.08.1991 | ||
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/13] | CH | 07.08.1991 | |
LI | 07.08.1991 | ||
SE | 07.08.1991 | ||
Former [1992/09] | CH | 07.08.1991 | |
LI | 07.08.1991 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]GB1058004 (KENNETH RICHARDSON MORTON); | [AD]US4307673 (CAUGHEY ROBERT A); | [YD]GB2183020 (BARNES ECAS LIMITED) |