EP0365153 - Energy storage means for a surgical stapler [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 28.06.1996 Database last updated on 23.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.08.1996 [1996/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ETHICON, INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville, New Jersey 08876 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states ETHICON INC. U.S. Route 22 Somerville New Jersey 08876 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fox, William D. 2606 Jett Hill Road New Richmond Ohio 45157 / US | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Fisher, Adrian John, et al Carpmaels & Ransford LLP One Southampton Row London WC1B 5HA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | Fisher, Adrian John, et al CARPMAELS & RANSFORD 43 Bloomsbury Square London WC1A 2RA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89309713.9 | 25.09.1989 | [1990/17] | Priority number, date | US19880249537 | 26.09.1988 Original published format: US 249537 | [1990/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0365153 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0365153 | Date: | 23.08.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.02.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61B17/10 | [1990/17] | CPC: |
A61B17/07207 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LU, NL, SE [1990/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung zur Energiespeicherung eines chirurgischen Klammerinstrumentes | [1990/17] | English: | Energy storage means for a surgical stapler | [1990/17] | French: | Moyen de stockage d'énergie pour une agrafeuse chirurgicale | [1990/17] | Examination procedure | 02.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/48] | 11.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.09.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.08.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 24.02.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.03.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 23.03.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/33] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 08.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4606343 (CONTA ROBERT L [US], et al); | [A]EP0178942 (SENMED INC [US]) |