EP0364146 - A seat assembly for a vehicle [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 07.07.1993 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.07.1993 | Refusal of application | published on 25.08.1993 [1993/34] | Applicant(s) | For:GB
Ford Motor Company Limited Eagle Way Brentwood Essex CM13 3BW / GB | For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Henry-Ford-Strasse 1 50725 Köln / DE | For:FR
FORD FRANCE S.A. B.P. 307 92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | For:GB
FORD MOTOR COMPANY LIMITED Eagle Way Brentwood, Essex CM13 3BW / GB | ||
For:DE
FORD-WERKE AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT D-50725 Köln / DE | |||
For:FR
FORD FRANCE S. A. B.P. 307 F-92506 Rueil-Malmaison Cédex / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Martin, Norman Gene 2514 Maplewood Royal Oak Michigan 48073 / US | 02 /
Eubank, William James 15650 Gary Lane Livonia Michigan 48154 / US | [1990/16] | Representative(s) | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al Harrison IP Limited 3 Ebor House London Ebor Business Park Millfield Lane Nether Poppleton York YO26 6QY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/16] | Messulam, Alec Moses, et al A. Messulam & Co. 24 Broadway Leigh on Sea Essex SS9 1BN / GB | Application number, filing date | 89310104.8 | 03.10.1989 | [1990/16] | Priority number, date | US19880256447 | 12.10.1988 Original published format: US 256447 | [1990/16] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0364146 | Date: | 18.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/16] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0364146 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/36 | [1990/16] | CPC: |
B60N2/045 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/16] | Title | German: | Sitzeinheit für Fahrzeuge | [1990/16] | English: | A seat assembly for a vehicle | [1990/16] | French: | Ensemble de siège pour véhicule | [1990/16] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 27.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 16.07.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.02.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: ) | 24.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: formalities examination [1993/34] | 03.04.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US1418709 (MORRIS HARDMAN); | [A]GB297648 (HOOPER & COMPANY COACHBUILDERS, et al); | [A]US2629425 (JAMES VARNELL L R); | [A]FR2556294 (RENAULT [FR]) |