EP0375120 - Nuclear event detectors [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.10.1993 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.10.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 24.11.1993 [1993/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GEC-MARCONI (HOLDINGS) LIMITED The Grove, Warren Lane Stanmore, Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | [1992/12] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states GEC-MARCONI LIMITED The Grove, Warren Lane Stanmore, Middlesex HA7 4LY / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Larner, David John Magnolia Cottage Norton Lane Lynsted Nr. Sittingbourne Kent ME9 OE2 / GB | 02 /
Goodchild, Clive David 15 Vauxhall Close Northfleet Kent / GB | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Pope, Michael Bertram Wingate The General Electric Company, p.l.c. GEC Patent Department Waterhouse Lane Chelmsford, Essex CM1 2QX / GB | [1990/26] | Application number, filing date | 89310178.2 | 04.10.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | GB19880023398 | 05.10.1988 Original published format: GB 8823398 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0375120 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375120 | Date: | 02.12.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.05.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G01T1/17, G01T1/24 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
H02H5/005 (EP,US);
G01T1/17 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT [1990/26] | Title | German: | Detektoren für nukleare Ereignisse | [1990/26] | English: | Nuclear event detectors | [1990/26] | French: | Détecteur pour événement nucléaire | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 30.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 07.08.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.10.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.12.1991 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.05.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.06.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 09.06.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.09.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1993/47] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A] - EDN ELECTRICAL DESIGN NEWS, vol. 30, August 1985, pages 133-140, Mass, US; LONGDEN & TRIPPE: "Hybrid detector protects circuits from radiation" | [A] - IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON NUCLEAR SCIENCE, vol. NS33, no. 1, February 1986, pages 347-350, IEEE, New York, US; LEROSE et al.: "Microstrip detectors with inverted structure" |