EP0375122 - Stabilized sucralose complex [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.06.1995 Database last updated on 15.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states WARNER-LAMBERT COMPANY 201 Tabor Road Morris Plains New Jersey 07950 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Cherukuri, Subraman Rao 10 Jean Drive Towaco New Jersey 07082 / US | 02 /
Wong, Lucy Lee 31-21 78th Street Jackson Heights New York 11370 / US | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Tesch, Rudolf, et al Warner-Lambert Company, Legal Division, Patent Department, c/o Pfizer GmbH, Arzneimittelwerk Gödecke, Mooswaldallee 1 79090 Freiburg / DE | [N/P] |
Former [1993/39] | Tesch, Rudolf, et al c/o Gödecke AG, Patentwesen D-79090 Freiburg / DE | ||
Former [1990/26] | Jones, Michael Raymond HASELTINE LAKE & CO. Hazlitt House 28 Southampton Buildings Chancery Lane London WC2A 1AT / GB | Application number, filing date | 89310553.6 | 13.10.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | US19880288512 | 22.12.1988 Original published format: US 288512 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0375122 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0375122 | Date: | 19.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/51] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375122 | Date: | 27.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A23L1/236, A23G3/30, A61K7/16 | [1991/01] | CPC: |
A23G3/346 (EP,US);
A23L27/30 (KR);
A23G4/10 (EP,US);
A23G4/20 (EP,US);
A23L27/37 (EP,US);
A61K47/6951 (EP,US);
B82Y5/00 (EP,US);
C08B37/0015 (EP,US);
C08L5/16 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
A23G3/346, A23G2200/06 (US,EP);
A23G3/346, A23G2220/20 (EP,US);
A23V2002/00, A23V2250/264, A23V2200/224, A23V2200/048, A23V2250/5114 (US,EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/26] | A23L1/236 | Designated contracting states | BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Stabilisierte Sucralosekomplexe | [1990/26] | English: | Stabilized sucralose complex | [1990/26] | French: | Complexes de sucralose stabilisés | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 18.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/07] | 27.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 14.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 27.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 25.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 07.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 27.07.1994 | CH | 27.07.1994 | ES | 27.07.1994 | FR | 27.07.1994 | GR | 27.07.1994 | IT | 27.07.1994 | LI | 27.07.1994 | NL | 27.07.1994 | GB | 27.10.1994 | SE | 27.10.1994 | DE | 28.10.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [2002/24] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
CH | 27.07.1994 | ||
ES | 27.07.1994 | ||
GR | 27.07.1994 | ||
IT | 27.07.1994 | ||
LI | 27.07.1994 | ||
NL | 27.07.1994 | ||
GB | 27.10.1994 | ||
SE | 27.10.1994 | ||
DE | 28.10.1994 | ||
FR | 23.12.1994 | ||
Former [2000/04] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
CH | 27.07.1994 | ||
GR | 27.07.1994 | ||
IT | 27.07.1994 | ||
LI | 27.07.1994 | ||
NL | 27.07.1994 | ||
GB | 27.10.1994 | ||
SE | 27.10.1994 | ||
DE | 28.10.1994 | ||
FR | 23.12.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
CH | 27.07.1994 | ||
IT | 27.07.1994 | ||
LI | 27.07.1994 | ||
NL | 27.07.1994 | ||
GB | 27.10.1994 | ||
SE | 27.10.1994 | ||
DE | 28.10.1994 | ||
FR | 23.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/44] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
CH | 27.07.1994 | ||
LI | 27.07.1994 | ||
NL | 27.07.1994 | ||
GB | 27.10.1994 | ||
SE | 27.10.1994 | ||
DE | 28.10.1994 | ||
FR | 23.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
CH | 27.07.1994 | ||
LI | 27.07.1994 | ||
NL | 27.07.1994 | ||
SE | 27.10.1994 | ||
DE | 28.10.1994 | ||
FR | 23.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/28] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
CH | 27.07.1994 | ||
LI | 27.07.1994 | ||
NL | 27.07.1994 | ||
DE | 28.10.1994 | ||
FR | 23.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
CH | 27.07.1994 | ||
LI | 27.07.1994 | ||
NL | 27.07.1994 | ||
DE | 28.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
CH | 27.07.1994 | ||
LI | 27.07.1994 | ||
DE | 28.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | BE | 27.07.1994 | |
CH | 27.07.1994 | ||
LI | 27.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | CH | 27.07.1994 | |
LI | 27.07.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]GB1543167 (TATE & LYLE LTD); | [A]EP0097950 (AJINOMOTO KK [JP]); | [AD]GB2169601 (TATE & LYLE PLC); | [AD]EP0255260 (TATE & LYLE PLC [GB]); | [A]EP0267809 (TATE & LYLE PLC [GB]); | [A]US4751095 (KARL CURTIS L [US], et al) |