EP0366320 - Optical fiber connector [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.11.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): ES | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Corning Incorporated Houghton Park Corning NY 14831 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | For all designated states Corning Incorporated Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | ||
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states CORNING INCORPORATED Houghton Park Corning New York 14831 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Newhouse, Mark Andrew 225 Watauga Avenue Corning New York / US | 02 /
Nolan, Daniel Aloysius 28 Skyline Drive Corning New York / US | 03 /
Weidman, David Lee 17 Upper Drive Corning New York / US | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | Boon, Graham Anthony, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 89310596.5 | 16.10.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | US19880261270 | 24.10.1988 Original published format: US 261270 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0366320 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0366320 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0366320 | Date: | 28.12.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/52] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.04.1991 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/28, G02B6/42, G02B6/14, G02B6/26 | [1991/27] | CPC: |
G02B6/4202 (EP,US);
G02B6/262 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/18] | G02B6/26, G02B6/38, G02B6/42, G02B6/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/18] | Title | German: | Faseroptischer Stecker | [1990/18] | English: | Optical fiber connector | [1990/18] | French: | Connecteur à fibre optique | [1990/18] | Examination procedure | 31.10.1991 | Examination requested [1991/52] | 08.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 26.04.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 23.06.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 23.06.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 29.09.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 17.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 12.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.12.1994 | BE | 28.12.1994 | CH | 28.12.1994 | ES | 28.12.1994 | IT | 28.12.1994 | LI | 28.12.1994 | SE | 28.03.1995 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 28.12.1994 | |
BE | 28.12.1994 | ||
CH | 28.12.1994 | ||
IT | 28.12.1994 | ||
LI | 28.12.1994 | ||
SE | 28.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | AT | 28.12.1994 | |
BE | 28.12.1994 | ||
CH | 28.12.1994 | ||
LI | 28.12.1994 | ||
SE | 28.03.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 28.12.1994 | |
CH | 28.12.1994 | ||
LI | 28.12.1994 | ||
Former [1995/32] | CH | 28.12.1994 | |
LI | 28.12.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE3544136 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [A]US4763976 (NOLAN DANIEL A [US], et al) | [AT] - IEEE JOURNAL OF QUANTUM ELECTRONICS, vol. 24, no. 5, May 1988, pages 758-765; M. CADA et al.: "Intrinsic modes in tapered optical waveguides" | [XP] - OPTICAL FIBER COMMUNICATION CONFERENCE, 1989 TECHNICAL DIGEST SERIES, Houston, Texas, 6 - 9 February 1989, vol. 5, page 77; D.L. WEIDEMAN et al.: "W12 nonadiabatically tapered waveguides" | Examination | JPS5635106 | EP0076186 |