EP0366331 - System and method for error detection in the result of an arithmetic operation [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/18] | Error detection and correction systems | ||
[1996/13] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.01.1997 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.02.2006 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 05.04.2006 [2006/14] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale CA 94088-3453 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES, INC. 901 Thompson Place P.O. Box 3453 Sunnyvale, CA 94088 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Asghar, Safdar Mahmood 7010 Quill Leaf Cove Austin Texas 78750 / US | 02 /
Bartkowiak, John Gray 4702 Trail Crest Circle Austin Texas 78735 / US | 03 /
Suss, Eric Allen 2239 Cromwell Circle, Apt.No.204 Austin Texas 78741 / US | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | Sanders, Peter Colin Christopher, et al BROOKES & MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89310634.4 | 17.10.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | US19880262658 | 26.10.1988 Original published format: US 262658 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0366331 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0366331 | Date: | 13.05.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0366331 | Date: | 27.03.1996 | Language: | EN | [1996/13] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.03.1992 | Classification | IPC: | G06F11/14 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
G06F11/1497 (EP,US);
G06F11/104 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/18] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung und Verfahren zur Fehlererkennung in das Ergebnis einer arithmetische Operation | [1996/13] | English: | System and method for error detection in the result of an arithmetic operation | [1996/13] | French: | Système et méthode de détection d'erreur dans le résultat d'une opération arithmétique | [1996/13] |
Former [1990/18] | Systeme zur Fehlererkennung und Fehlerkorrektur | ||
Former [1990/18] | Error detection and correction systems | ||
Former [1990/18] | Systèmes à détection et correction d'erreur | Examination procedure | 23.10.1992 | Examination requested [1992/53] | 08.04.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.10.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.03.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 28.12.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1997/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 05.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 04.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 04.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.03.1996 | BE | 27.03.1996 | CH | 27.03.1996 | ES | 27.03.1996 | FR | 27.03.1996 | GR | 27.03.1996 | LI | 27.03.1996 | NL | 27.03.1996 | SE | 27.06.1996 | LU | 31.10.1996 | [2006/14] |
Former [2003/07] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
CH | 27.03.1996 | ||
ES | 27.03.1996 | ||
GR | 27.03.1996 | ||
LI | 27.03.1996 | ||
NL | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [2002/24] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
CH | 27.03.1996 | ||
ES | 27.03.1996 | ||
GR | 27.03.1996 | ||
LI | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
CH | 27.03.1996 | ||
GR | 27.03.1996 | ||
LI | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
LU | 31.10.1996 | ||
Former [1997/13] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
CH | 27.03.1996 | ||
LI | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/12] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
FR | 23.08.1996 | ||
Former [1997/03] | AT | 27.03.1996 | |
BE | 27.03.1996 | ||
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/52] | BE | 27.03.1996 | |
SE | 27.06.1996 | ||
Former [1996/44] | SE | 27.06.1996 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3098994 (BROWN JR THOMAS G); | [X]US3814923 (WANG T); | [X]US3816728 (CHEN T, et al); | [Y]US4181969 (SMITH WINTHROP W JR [US]); | [A]GB2033115 (BURTSEV V, et al) | [X] - INSTUMENTS AND CONTROL SYSTEMS vol. 37, no. 8, August 1964, RADNOR, P.A., 19089, U.S.A. pages 129 - 131; C.F. PAGE: 'Checking in Data Processing' | [A] - IEEE INT. SYMPOSIUM ON CIRCUITS AND SYSTEMS 2 May 1983, NEWPORT BEACH, CALIFORNIA, U.S.A. pages 701 - 704; W.K. JENKINS: 'A NEW TECHNIQUE USING BIASED ADDITION FOR GENERATING PROJECTIONS IN ERROR-CORRECTING RESIDUE CODES' | [X] - MCGRAW-HILL BOOK COMPANY 1967, NEW YORK, U.S.A. N.S. SZAB ET AL.: 'RESIDUE ARITHMETIC AND ITS APPLICATIONS TO COMPUTER TECHNOLOGY' |