EP0365323 - Device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 22.12.1994 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Glaxo Wellcome House, Berkeley Avenue Greenford, Middlesex UB6 0NN / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | For all designated states GLAXO GROUP LIMITED Clarges House 6-12 Clarges Street London W1Y 8DH / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rumbol, Edwin Vincent 96 London Road Brentwood Essex CN14 4NT / GB | [1990/17] | Representative(s) | Charlton, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife LLP Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/17] | Charlton, Peter John, et al Elkington and Fife Prospect House 8 Pembroke Road Sevenoaks, Kent TN13 1XR / GB | Application number, filing date | 89310761.5 | 19.10.1989 | [1990/17] | Priority number, date | GB19880024596 | 20.10.1988 Original published format: GB 8824596 | [1990/17] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0365323 | Date: | 25.04.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/17] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0365323 | Date: | 15.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/20] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0365323 | Date: | 16.02.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/07] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.03.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B01F15/00, B01F15/02 | [1994/07] | CPC: |
B01F35/45 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/17] | B01F15/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/17] | Title | German: | Vorrichtung | [1990/17] | English: | Device | [1990/17] | French: | Dispositif | [1990/17] | Examination procedure | 08.11.1991 | Examination requested [1992/02] | 20.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 03.03.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 19.07.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 06.08.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 08.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 18.11.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 16.02.1994 | BE | 16.02.1994 | CH | 16.02.1994 | DE | 16.02.1994 | FR | 16.02.1994 | IT | 16.02.1994 | LI | 16.02.1994 | NL | 16.02.1994 | SE | 16.02.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [1999/42] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
BE | 16.02.1994 | ||
CH | 16.02.1994 | ||
DE | 16.02.1994 | ||
IT | 16.02.1994 | ||
LI | 16.02.1994 | ||
NL | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1995/10] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
BE | 16.02.1994 | ||
CH | 16.02.1994 | ||
DE | 16.02.1994 | ||
LI | 16.02.1994 | ||
NL | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/49] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
BE | 16.02.1994 | ||
CH | 16.02.1994 | ||
DE | 16.02.1994 | ||
LI | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/47] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
CH | 16.02.1994 | ||
DE | 16.02.1994 | ||
LI | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/46] | AT | 16.02.1994 | |
DE | 16.02.1994 | ||
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | DE | 16.02.1994 | |
SE | 16.02.1994 | ||
Former [1994/45] | SE | 16.02.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [AP]JP1110104 ; | [AD]GB2100610 (NARA MACHINERY CO LTD [JP]); | [A]DE3438130 (JOHANSSON LARS) | [AP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 327 (M-854)(3675), 24 July 1989; & JP - A - 1110104 (HITACHI ZOSEN CORP.) 26.04.1989, & JP1110104 A 19890724 |