EP0366447 - Electrostatic photographic liquid developer [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.05.1996 Database last updated on 18.05.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.05.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.07.1996 [1996/29] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami-Ashigara-shi, Kanagawa-ken / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | For all designated states FUJI PHOTO FILM CO., LTD. 210 Nakanuma Minami Ashigara-shi Kanagawa / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kato, Eiichi c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Ishii, Kazuo c/o Fuji Photo Film Co., Ltd. 4000 Kawashiri Yoshida-cho Haibara-gun Shizuoka / JP | [1990/18] | Representative(s) | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al Brookes Batchellor 1 Boyne Park Tunbridge Wells Kent TN4 8EL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/18] | Blake, John Henry Francis, et al BROOKES AND MARTIN High Holborn House 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311005.6 | 25.10.1989 | [1990/18] | Priority number, date | JP19880269468 | 27.10.1988 Original published format: JP 26946888 | [1990/18] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0366447 | Date: | 02.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/18] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0366447 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0366447 | Date: | 26.07.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G03G9/13 | [1990/18] | CPC: |
G03G9/131 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, GB [1990/18] | Title | German: | Flüssiger Entwickler für elektrostatische Photographie | [1990/18] | English: | Electrostatic photographic liquid developer | [1990/18] | French: | Développateur liquide pour photographie électrostatique | [1990/18] | Examination procedure | 24.06.1991 | Examination requested [1991/34] | 26.10.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 14.02.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.12.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 25.01.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 30.01.1995 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 12.04.1995 | Fee for grant paid | 12.04.1995 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.04.1996 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/29] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 06.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 30.09.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP60185963 ; | [AD]EP0155788 (FUJI PHOTO FILM CO LTD [JP]); | [AD]US4665002 (DAN SHIGEYUKI [JP], et al) | [AD] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 10, no. 38 (P-428)(2095) 14 February 1986, & JP-A-60 185963 (FUJI SHASHIN FILM K.K.) 21 September 1985,, & JP60185963 A 19850921 | Examination | EP0366492 |