EP0367561 - Small inexpensive finisher [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 04.12.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.12.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 26.01.1994 [1994/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Xerox Corporation Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | For all designated states XEROX CORPORATION Xerox Square - 020 Rochester New York 14644 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Christy, Kenneth G. 126 South Avenue Webster New York 14580 / US | 02 /
Cooper, Thomas F. 6054 Calm Lake Drive Farmington New York 14425 / US | 03 /
Dastin, Richard M. 145 Selborne Chase Fairport New York 14450 / US | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Essex House 12/13 Essex Street London WC2R 3AA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | Goode, Ian Roy, et al Rank Xerox Ltd Patent Department Parkway Marlow Buckinghamshire SL7 1YL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311233.4 | 31.10.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | US19880264562 | 31.10.1988 Original published format: US 264562 | [1990/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0367561 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0367561 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367561 | Date: | 03.02.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 18.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B65H31/36, B65H31/40 | [1990/25] | CPC: |
B65H31/3054 (EP,US);
B42B4/00 (EP,US);
B65H31/38 (EP,US);
G03G15/6541 (EP,US);
G03G2215/00827 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/19] | B65H31/40 | Designated contracting states | FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/19] | Title | German: | Kleines und billiges Endbearbeitungsgerät | [1990/19] | English: | Small inexpensive finisher | [1990/19] | French: | Petit dispositif économique pour le finissage | [1990/19] | Examination procedure | 15.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/02] | 31.03.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 31.07.1992 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 28.10.1992 | Fee for grant paid | 28.10.1992 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 04.11.1993 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/04] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XD]US4073391 (O BRIEN JOHN G, et al); | [XD]US4227275 (SOEDERBERG TERJE); | [X]US4354672 (KULPA WALTER J, et al); | [A]US4078790 (STOCKER LESTER H) |