EP0369642 - Method of melting materials [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [1990/21] | Method of melting materials and apparatus therefor | ||
[1997/11] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.01.1998 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TETRONICS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LIMITED 5B Lechlade Road Faringdon Oxfordshire, SN7 9AJ / GB | For all designated states Johns Manville Corporation 10100 W. Ute Avenue Littleton, CO 80127 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1998/09] | For all designated states TETRONICS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LIMITED 5B Lechlade Road Faringdon Oxfordshire, SN7 9AJ / GB | ||
For all designated states SCHULLER CORPORATION 717 17th Street Denver Colorado 80202 / US | |||
Former [1996/52] | For all designated states TETRONICS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LIMITED 5B Lechlade Road Faringdon Oxfordshire, SN7 9AJ / GB | ||
For all designated states SCHULLER CORPORATION P.O. Box 5108 Denver, Colorado 80217-5108 / US | |||
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states TETRONICS RESEARCH & DEVELOPMENT COMPANY LIMITED 5B Lechlade Road Faringdon Oxfordshire, SN7 9AJ / GB | ||
For all designated states MANVILLE CORPORATION Patent and Licensing Department P.O. Box 5108 Denver, CO 80217-5108 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Williams, John Kenneth 4 St Denys Close Stanford In The Vale Faringdon Oxfordshire, SN7 8NJ / GB | 02 /
Olds, Leonard Elmo 977 South Lake Gulch Road Castle Rock Colorado, 80107 / US | 03 /
Heanley, Charles Peter Chieveley House Little Coxwell Faringdon Oxfordshire, SN7 7LW / GB | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT WADE TENNANT, Verulam Gardens 70 Gray's Inn Road London WC1X 8BT / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | Allard, Susan Joyce, et al BOULT, WADE & TENNANT 27 Furnival Street London EC4A 1PQ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311298.7 | 01.11.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | GB19880026862 | 17.11.1988 Original published format: GB 8826862 | GB19890011443 | 18.05.1989 Original published format: GB 8911443 | [1990/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0369642 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0369642 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369642 | Date: | 12.03.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F27B14/06, F27B14/08, H05B7/00, F27D11/10, C03B5/14 | [1991/01] | CPC: |
F27D27/00 (EP,US);
C03B5/025 (EP,US);
C03B5/14 (EP,US);
F27B14/08 (EP,US);
F27B3/06 (EP,US);
F27B3/08 (EP,US);
F27D11/10 (EP,US);
F27D3/0025 (EP,US);
H05B7/00 (EP,US);
C03B2211/70 (EP,US);
F27B2014/0812 (EP,US);
F27B2014/0887 (EP,US);
F27D2003/0087 (EP,US);
F27D2099/0031 (EP,US);
F27M2001/03 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/21] | F27B14/06, F27B14/08, H05B7/00, F27D11/10 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/21] | Title | German: | Verfahren zum Schmelzen von Stoffen | [1997/11] | English: | Method of melting materials | [1997/11] | French: | Méthode pour fondre des matériaux | [1997/11] |
Former [1990/21] | Verfahren zum Schmelzen von Stoffen und Apparat dafür | ||
Former [1990/21] | Method of melting materials and apparatus therefor | ||
Former [1990/21] | Méthode pour fondre des matériaux et appareil pour cela | Examination procedure | 18.02.1991 | Examination requested [1991/16] | 14.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.12.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.01.1994 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.07.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 07.09.1994 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1995 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.05.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.08.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 05.08.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.12.1997 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/10] | Request for further processing for: | 07.09.1994 | Request for further processing filed | 07.09.1994 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 22.09.1994 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 12.03.1997 | CH | 12.03.1997 | ES | 12.03.1997 | GR | 12.03.1997 | LI | 12.03.1997 | SE | 12.06.1997 | LU | 01.11.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
CH | 12.03.1997 | ||
ES | 12.03.1997 | ||
GR | 12.03.1997 | ||
LI | 12.03.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
CH | 12.03.1997 | ||
GR | 12.03.1997 | ||
LI | 12.03.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/11] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
CH | 12.03.1997 | ||
LI | 12.03.1997 | ||
SE | 12.06.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 12.03.1997 | |
CH | 12.03.1997 | ||
LI | 12.03.1997 | ||
Former [1997/42] | AT | 12.03.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US3917479 (SAYCE IAN GEORGE, et al); | [A]EP0118412 (VOEST ALPINE AG [AT]); | [A]GB2140902 (PPG INDUSTRIES INC); | [A]US4492594 (CURLEY JOHN E [US]); | [A]US4671765 (TSAI YIH-WAN [US]) |