EP0367612 - Load controlled ECL transient driver [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.11.1994 Database last updated on 23.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state Updated state(s): FR | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MOTOROLA, INC. 1303 East Algonquin Road Schaumburg, IL 60196 / US | [1990/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Schucker, Douglas W. 3724 E Dragoon Mesa Arizona 85206 / US | 02 /
Weaver, David B. 1727 W Emelita Nr. 2023 Mesa Arizona 85202 / US | 03 /
Hickman, Pat 629 W Straford Drive Chandler Arizona 85224 / US | 04 /
Seelback, Walter C. 12009 Organ Pipe Circle P.O. Box 17485 Fountain Hills Arizona 85260 / US | [1990/19] | Representative(s) | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Motorola European Intellectual Property Operations Midpoint Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/19] | Dunlop, Hugh Christopher, et al Motorola, European Intellectual Property, Midpoint, Alencon Link Basingstoke, Hampshire RG21 7PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311372.0 | 02.11.1989 | [1990/19] | Priority number, date | US19880266613 | 03.11.1988 Original published format: US 266613 | [1990/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0367612 | Date: | 09.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/19] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0367612 | Date: | 25.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0367612 | Date: | 12.01.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.06.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H03K19/013, H03K19/086 | [1990/19] | CPC: |
H03K19/086 (EP,US);
H03K19/0136 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/19] | Title | German: | Lastgesteuerter ECL-Treiber | [1990/19] | English: | Load controlled ECL transient driver | [1990/19] | French: | Circuit ECL d'attaque commandé par la charge | [1990/19] | Examination procedure | 10.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/11] | 05.10.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.05.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 07.07.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.10.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 01.10.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 13.10.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | FR | 12.01.1994 | IT | 12.01.1994 | NL | 12.01.1994 | [2006/14] |
Former [1999/42] | IT | 12.01.1994 | |
NL | 12.01.1994 | ||
FR | 03.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/08] | NL | 12.01.1994 | |
FR | 03.06.1994 | ||
Former [1995/04] | FR | 03.06.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP61269524 ; | [X]WO8504774 (ADVANCED MICRO DEVICES INC [US]); | [XP]EP0294163 (FUJITSU LTD [JP]) | [X] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN, vol. 27, no. 12, May 1985, pages 7128-7129, New York, US; "Low power tri-state push-pull driver with transient power pulldown" | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. 122 (E-500)[2569], 16th April 1987; & JP-A-61 269 524 (HITACHI LTD) 28-11-1986, & JP61269524 A 00000000 |