EP0369680 - Window regulator mechanism with kick-out feature [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.11.1995 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EXCEL INDUSTRIES INC 1120 North Main Street Elkhart Indiana 46514 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/10] | For all designated states EXCEL INDUSTRIES INC 1120 North Main Street Elkhart, Indiana 46514 / US | ||
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states HOOVER UNIVERSAL, INC. 825, Victors Way Ann Arbor Michigan 48104 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kracht, Thomas Frank 22418 Van St. Clair Shores Michigan / US | 02 /
Lawrence, Jeffrey Stephen 28235 Ryan Road Warren Michigan 48092 / US | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1995/02] | Senior, Alan Murray, et al J.A. KEMP & CO., 14 South Square, Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1990/21] | Williams, Trevor John J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5EU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311607.9 | 09.11.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | US19880272639 | 17.11.1988 Original published format: US 272639 | [1990/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0369680 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0369680 | Date: | 27.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/13] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369680 | Date: | 11.01.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.02.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B60J1/17, E05F11/52 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
B60J1/17 (EP);
B60J1/12 (KR);
B60J1/02 (KR);
E05F11/525 (EP);
E05Y2900/55 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/21] | Title | German: | Fensterheber mit Rückstelleinrichtung | [1990/21] | English: | Window regulator mechanism with kick-out feature | [1990/21] | French: | Mécanisme de manoeuvre de lève-vitre avec dispositif de rappel | [1990/21] | Examination procedure | 02.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/39] | 26.06.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.04.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.12.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.01.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.07.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.10.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 19.10.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.10.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1996/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 07.11.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 11.01.1995 | BE | 11.01.1995 | CH | 11.01.1995 | ES | 11.01.1995 | GR | 11.01.1995 | IT | 11.01.1995 | LI | 11.01.1995 | NL | 11.01.1995 | SE | 11.04.1995 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
CH | 11.01.1995 | ||
ES | 11.01.1995 | ||
GR | 11.01.1995 | ||
IT | 11.01.1995 | ||
LI | 11.01.1995 | ||
NL | 11.01.1995 | ||
SE | 11.04.1995 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
CH | 11.01.1995 | ||
GR | 11.01.1995 | ||
IT | 11.01.1995 | ||
LI | 11.01.1995 | ||
NL | 11.01.1995 | ||
SE | 11.04.1995 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
CH | 11.01.1995 | ||
IT | 11.01.1995 | ||
LI | 11.01.1995 | ||
NL | 11.01.1995 | ||
SE | 11.04.1995 | ||
Former [1996/03] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
CH | 11.01.1995 | ||
LI | 11.01.1995 | ||
NL | 11.01.1995 | ||
SE | 11.04.1995 | ||
Former [1995/49] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
CH | 11.01.1995 | ||
LI | 11.01.1995 | ||
NL | 11.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/42] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
BE | 11.01.1995 | ||
CH | 11.01.1995 | ||
LI | 11.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/40] | AT | 11.01.1995 | |
CH | 11.01.1995 | ||
LI | 11.01.1995 | ||
Former [1995/32] | CH | 11.01.1995 | |
LI | 11.01.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]FR2242550 (SIRP SPA [IT]); | [X]FR2279581 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]) |