EP0369715 - Boehmite-type aluminium hydroxide, process for preparing same and phosphate ion adsorbent containing same as effective component [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.06.1994 Database last updated on 13.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.06.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.08.1994 [1994/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states TOMITA PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION LIMITED 85-1, Aza-Maruyama Akinokami Seto-cho Naruto-shi Tokushima 771-03 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states TOMITA PHARMACEUTICAL CORPORATION LIMITED 85-1, Aza-Maruyama Akinokami Seto-cho Naruto-shi Tokushima 771-03 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kabayama, Mineaki 214, Aza-Kamihonjyo Akinokami Seto-cho Naruto-shi Tokushima-ken / JP | 02 /
Suzuki, Takeshi 1-50-403, Kitaokinosu 1-chome Tokushima-shi Tokushima-ken / JP | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers Goldings House 2 Hays Lane London SE1 2HW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/21] | Arthur, Bryan Edward, et al Withers & Rogers 4 Dyer's Buildings Holborn London EC1N 2JT / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311734.1 | 13.11.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | JP19880288592 | 14.11.1988 Original published format: JP 28859288 | [1990/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0369715 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369715 | Date: | 11.08.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/32] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C01F7/74, A61K33/08 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
C01F7/74 (EP,US);
A61K33/06 (EP,US);
A61P39/02 (EP);
C01F7/02 (EP,US);
C01P2002/72 (EP,US);
C01P2002/82 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/21] | Title | German: | Aluminiumhydroxid vom Boehmit-Typ, Verfahren zu dessen Herstellung und das Hydroxid als wirksamen Bestandteil enthaltendes Phosphationen-Adsorptionsmittel | [1990/21] | English: | Boehmite-type aluminium hydroxide, process for preparing same and phosphate ion adsorbent containing same as effective component | [1990/21] | French: | Hydroxyde d'aluminium de type böhmite, procédé de préparation et absorbant pour ions phosphates le contenant comme composé actif | [1990/21] | Examination procedure | 29.10.1990 | Examination requested [1990/52] | 10.11.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 18.02.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.05.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 10.05.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 12.05.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]FR2303553 (MADAUS & CO DR [DE]); | [A]EP0072142 (ARMOUR PHARMA [US]); | [A]DE3147869 (NEFRO PHARMA ARZNEIMITTEL [DE]) |