EP0376459 - Recording heads with side shields [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 06.03.1998 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.07.2004 | Change - lapse in a contracting state Updated state(s): LU | published on 15.09.2004 [2004/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 500 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas, CA 95035 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/13] | For all designated states QUANTUM CORPORATION 500 McCarthy Boulevard Milpitas California 95035 / US | ||
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORPORATION 111 Powdermill Road Maynard Massachusetts 01754-1418 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Das, Shyam Chandra 7, Shadow Oak Drive Sudbury Massachusetts 01776 / US | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter Clarkson, Park View House, 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | Goodman, Christopher, et al Eric Potter & Clarkson St. Mary's Court St. Mary's Gate Nottingham NG1 1LE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311811.7 | 15.11.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | US19880292397 | 30.12.1988 Original published format: US 292397 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0376459 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0376459 | Date: | 13.10.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0376459 | Date: | 02.05.1997 | Language: | EN | [1997/18] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.08.1993 | Classification | IPC: | G11B5/11, G11B5/127, G11B5/187, G11B5/31, G11B5/33, G11B5/39 | [1997/18] | CPC: |
G11B5/3925 (EP);
G11B5/11 (EP);
G11B5/1278 (EP);
G11B5/187 (EP);
G11B5/3116 (EP);
G11B5/3143 (EP);
|
Former IPC [1990/27] | G11B5/127, G11B5/187, G11B5/33, G11B5/11, G11B5/39, // G11B5/31 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/27] | Title | German: | Aufzeichnungsköpfe mit Seitenabschirmung | [1990/27] | English: | Recording heads with side shields | [1990/27] | French: | Têtes d'enregistrement à écrans latéraux | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 24.11.1989 | Examination requested [1990/27] | 05.04.1995 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.10.1995 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 21.02.1996 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.05.1996 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.1996 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.11.1996 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 13.12.1996 | Fee for grant paid | 13.12.1996 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.02.1998 | No opposition filed within time limit [1998/17] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.10.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 31.10.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.10.1995 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.10.1996 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 02.05.1997 | BE | 02.05.1997 | CH | 02.05.1997 | ES | 02.05.1997 | GR | 02.05.1997 | LI | 02.05.1997 | SE | 02.08.1997 | LU | 15.11.1997 | [2004/38] |
Former [2002/24] | AT | 02.05.1997 | |
BE | 02.05.1997 | ||
CH | 02.05.1997 | ||
ES | 02.05.1997 | ||
GR | 02.05.1997 | ||
LI | 02.05.1997 | ||
SE | 02.08.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [2000/04] | AT | 02.05.1997 | |
BE | 02.05.1997 | ||
CH | 02.05.1997 | ||
GR | 02.05.1997 | ||
LI | 02.05.1997 | ||
SE | 02.08.1997 | ||
LU | 30.11.1997 | ||
Former [1998/12] | AT | 02.05.1997 | |
BE | 02.05.1997 | ||
CH | 02.05.1997 | ||
LI | 02.05.1997 | ||
SE | 02.08.1997 | ||
Former [1998/10] | AT | 02.05.1997 | |
BE | 02.05.1997 | ||
CH | 02.05.1997 | ||
LI | 02.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/04] | AT | 02.05.1997 | |
CH | 02.05.1997 | ||
LI | 02.05.1997 | ||
Former [1998/02] | AT | 02.05.1997 | Documents cited: | Search | [XP]JP1091313 ; | [A]JP59119522 ; | [A]JP57189321 ; | [A]JP59227022 ; | [A]JP62291713 ; | [A]JP58108018 ; | [A]JP63029311 ; | [X]US3355727 (GAUBATZ DONALD C); | [X]GB2092807 (OLIVETTI & CO SPA); | [XP]WO8802166 (JAPAN BROADCASTING CORP [JP], et al); | [XP]JPH01224909 (HITACHI LTD); | [XP]EP0333347 (DIGITAL EQUIPMENT CORP [US]) | [XP] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 13, no. 324 (P-903)(3672) 21 July 1989 & JP-A-10 91 313 ( NEC CORP ), & JP1091313 A 19890721 | [A] - IBM TECHNICAL DISCLOSURE BULLETIN. vol. 23, no. 11, April 1981, ARMONK, NY, US pages 5097 - 5098 P. A. ALBERT ET AL. | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 248 (P-313)14 November 1984 & JP-A-59 119 522 ( SUWA SEIKOSHA K.K. ) 10 July 1984, & JP59119522 A 19840710 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 038 (P-176)16 February 1983 & JP-A-57 189 321 ( FUJITSU K. K. ) 20 November 1982, & JP57189321 A 19821120 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 105 (P-354)9 May 1985 & JP-A-59 227 022 ( SANYO DENKI K.K. ) 20 December 1984, & JP59227022 A 19841220 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 180 (P-709)27 May 1988 & JP-A-62 291 713 ( NEC CORP ) 18 December 1987, & JP62291713 A 19871218 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 7, no. 212 (P-224)20 September 1983 & JP-A-58 108 018 ( SUWA SEIKOSHA K.K. ) 28 June 1983, & JP58108018 A 19830628 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 238 (P-726)7 July 1988 & JP-A-63 029 311 ( ALPS ELECTRIC CO LTD ) 8 February 1988, & JP63029311 A 19880208 | Examination | US4374403 | EP0317633 |