EP0369790 - Stretch/shrink film with improved oxygen transmission [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.09.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.1995 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): SE | published on 17.01.1996 [1996/03] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036-7794 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1994/25] | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036-7794 / US | ||
Former [1990/21] | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO. Grace Plaza 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Mueller, Walter Berndt 280 Bertha Burns Road Inman, SV 29349 / US | [1990/21] | Representative(s) | Bentham, Stephen, et al J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/32] | Bentham, Stephen, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1990/21] | Bentham, Stephen J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311885.1 | 16.11.1989 | [1990/21] | Priority number, date | US19880273385 | 17.11.1988 Original published format: US 273385 | [1990/21] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0369790 | Date: | 23.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/21] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0369790 | Date: | 30.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0369790 | Date: | 02.11.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/44] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.12.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B32B27/32, B32B27/28 | [1990/21] | CPC: |
B32B27/28 (EP,US);
B32B27/08 (US);
B32B27/16 (US);
B32B27/306 (US);
B32B27/32 (US);
B32B2250/246 (US);
B32B2307/724 (US);
B32B2323/046 (US);
B32B2331/04 (US);
Y10S428/91 (EP,US);
Y10T428/24992 (EP,US);
Y10T428/259 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31663 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31913 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31928 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31935 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/21] | Title | German: | Sauerstoffdurchlässiger Streck-/Schrumpf-Film | [1990/21] | English: | Stretch/shrink film with improved oxygen transmission | [1990/21] | French: | Film perméable à l'oxygène avec étirage/retrait | [1990/21] | Examination procedure | 22.07.1991 | Examination requested [1991/38] | 08.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.02.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 06.05.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.08.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 08.08.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 03.08.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 08.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | BE | 02.11.1994 | SE | 02.02.1995 | [1996/03] |
Former [1995/41] | BE | 02.11.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4514465 (SCHOENBERG JULIAN H [US]); | [AD]US4617241 (MUELLER WALTER B [US]); | [A]EP0286430 (GRACE W R & CO [US]) |