EP0428794 - Cartridge type cosmetic bar container [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.04.1995 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.06.1995 [1995/24] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states KANEBO, LTD. 17-4 Sumida 5-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | For all designated states KANEBO, LTD. 17-4 Sumida 5-chome Sumida-ku Tokyo 131 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Iwamoto, Yoichi 5-7, Baraki 4-chome Ichikawa-chi Chiba 272 / JP | 02 /
Iwamoto, Hisao 10-15, Honcho 4-chome Odawara-shi Kanagawa 250 / JP | [1991/22] | Representative(s) | Marlow, Nicholas Simon, et al Reddie & Grose LLP The White Chapel Building 10 Whitechapel High Street London E1 8QS / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1991/22] | Marlow, Nicholas Simon, et al Reddie & Grose 16, Theobalds Road London WC1X 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311891.9 | 16.11.1989 | [1991/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0428794 | Date: | 29.05.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0428794 | Date: | 22.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/25] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A45D40/06, A45D40/16 | [1991/22] | CPC: |
A45D40/16 (EP,US);
A45D40/06 (EP,US);
Y10S401/01 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL [1991/22] | Title | German: | Ersatzstiftbehälter für kosmetische Stifte | [1991/22] | English: | Cartridge type cosmetic bar container | [1991/22] | French: | Récipient à cartouche pour bâton de cosmétique | [1991/22] | Examination procedure | 09.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/22] | 01.02.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 04.06.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 23.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 23.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]JP6364312U ; | [A]US3335854 (JAMES LANDEN WILLIAM); | [A]GB731013 (PARBEL); | [A]US3272327 (JOHN BUSCH); | [A]US3146881 (METREAUD CLAUDE G, et al); | [A]FR1052053 (COTY SA) | [AD] - JP-U-6364312, & JP6364312U U 00000000 |