EP0370722 - Disk-storage device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 01.03.1994 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 01.03.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.04.1994 [1994/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states MITSUBISHI DENKI KABUSHIKI KAISHA 2-3, Marunouchi 2-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Motoyoshi, Takeo Itami Seisakusho Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 1-1, Tsukaguchi Hon-machi 8-chome Amagasaki City Hyogo Prefecture / JP | 02 /
Tanaka, Katsufusa Itami Seisakusho Mitsubishi Denki K.K. 1-1, Tsukaguchi Hon-machi 8-chome Amagasaki City Hyogo Prefecture / JP | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Hackett, Sean James, et al Marks & Clerk LLP 90 Long Acre London WC2E 9RA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | Hackett, Sean James, et al MARKS & CLERK, 57-60 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3LS / GB | Application number, filing date | 89311990.9 | 20.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | JP19880296524 | 24.11.1988 Original published format: JP 29652488 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0370722 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0370722 | Date: | 09.01.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/02] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G11B17/22, G11B27/026 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
G11B27/026 (EP,US);
G11B23/00 (KR);
G11B17/225 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/22] | Title | German: | Plattenspeichervorrichtung | [1990/22] | English: | Disk-storage device | [1990/22] | French: | Dispositif de rangement de disques | [1990/22] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 12.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/06] | 16.06.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.10.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/16] | 24.11.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP59091733 ; | [A]JP59090258 ; | [A]JP62283452 ; | [A]EP0240794 (CMX CORP [US]); | [A]US4355338 (YAMAMOTO TATUO, et al); | [A]EP0249314 (SONY CORP [JP]); | [A]EP0227446 (SONY CORP [JP]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 2, no. 125 (E-065) 20 October 1978, & JP-A-59 091 733 (HITACHI) 11 August 1978, & JP59091733 A 19780811 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 8, no. 204 (P-301)(1641) 18 September 1984, & JP-A-59 090 258 (SONY) 24 May 1984, & JP59090258 A 19840524 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 12, no. 173 (P-706)(3020) 24 May 1988, & JP-A-62 283 452 (TOSHIBA) 09 December 1987, & JP62283452 A 19871209 |