EP0370741 - Solder bonding material [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 31.08.1993 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | ||
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis MN 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunaway, Thomas J. 2512 Highway 100 South Apt. 423 St Louis Park Minnesota 55416 / US | 02 /
Loy, Jerald M. 3600 Rum River Drive Anoka Minnesota 55303 / US | 03 /
Spielberger, Richard K. 17814 - 83rd Avenue North Maple Grove Minnesota 55369 / US | 04 /
Dicks, Lori A. 8810 - 61st Avenue North New Hope Minnesota 55428 / US | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Honeywell Control Systems Limited, Honeywell House, Arlington Business Park Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312027.9 | 20.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | US19880274412 | 21.11.1988 Original published format: US 274412 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0370741 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.03.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/488, B23K35/26 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
B23K35/268 (EP,US);
H01L23/10 (KR);
H01L23/488 (EP,US);
H01L24/50 (EP,US);
H01L24/86 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/351 (EP,US);
Y10T428/12701 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/01322, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14, H01L2924/00 (US,EP);
H01L2924/351, H01L2924/00 (US,EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/22] | Title | German: | Lötmaterial | [1990/22] | English: | Solder bonding material | [1990/22] | French: | Matériau de soudure | [1990/22] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.11.1990 | Examination requested [1991/04] | 30.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.02.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.05.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [1993/42] | 06.06.1993 | Application refused, date of legal effect [1993/42] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4332343 (KOOPMAN NICHOLAS G, et al); | [A]EP0103025 (MITSUBISHI METAL CORP [JP], et al); | [A]EP0039160 (MINNESOTA MINING & MFG [US]); | [A]EP0193127 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) |