EP0370745 - Low-cost high-performance semiconductor chip package [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.06.1993 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.12.1994 | Change - applicant | published on 01.02.1995 [1995/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis, MN 55408 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1995/05] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis Minnesota 55408 / US | ||
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states HONEYWELL INC. Honeywell Plaza Minneapolis MN 55408 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunaway, Thomas J. 2512 Highway 100 South Apt. 423 St Louis Park Minnesota 55416 / US | 02 /
Dicks, Lori A. 8810 - 61st Avenue North New Hope Minnesota 55428 / US | 03 /
Spielberger, Richard K. 17814 - 83rd Avenue North Maple Grove Minnesota 55369 / US | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Potter Clarkson LLP The Belgrave Centre Talbot Street Nottingham NG1 5GG / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | Fox-Male, Nicholas Vincent Humbert Honeywell Control Systems Limited, Honeywell House, Arlington Business Park Bracknell, Berkshire RG12 1EB / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312032.9 | 20.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | US19880274290 | 21.11.1988 Original published format: US 274290 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0370745 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0370745 | Date: | 13.03.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/11] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.01.1991 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/057, H01L23/498, H01L21/50 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
H01L21/50 (EP,US);
H01L23/48 (KR);
H01L23/057 (EP,US);
H01L23/49861 (EP,US);
H01L24/24 (EP,US);
H01L24/82 (EP,US);
H01L2224/24227 (EP,US);
H01L2224/7665 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01005 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01006 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01023 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01029 (EP,US);
H01L2924/0103 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01033 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01078 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01079 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01082 (EP,US);
H01L2924/01322 (EP,US);
H01L2924/014 (EP,US);
H01L2924/07802 (EP,US);
H01L2924/14 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15153 (EP,US);
H01L2924/15165 (EP,US);
H01L2924/19041 (EP,US);
H01L2924/30105 (EP,US);
H01L2924/30107 (EP,US);
H01L2924/3011 (EP,US);
H01L2924/351 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
H01L2924/07802, H01L2924/00 (EP,US);
H01L2924/351, H01L2924/00 (US,EP) | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, NL [1990/22] | Title | German: | Halbleiterchip-Packung hoher Leistung und mit niedrigem Kostenaufwand | [1990/22] | English: | Low-cost high-performance semiconductor chip package | [1990/22] | French: | Empaquetage pour puce semi-conductrice à haute performance et à peu de frais | [1990/22] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 20.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/44] | 30.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.02.1993 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/32] | 10.03.1993 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP62188251 ; | [X]EP0009610 (SIEMENS AG [DE]); | [X]GB2103418 (BRACEY STANLEY); | [A]EP0091376 (FAIRCHILD CAMERA INSTR CO [US]); | [X]GB2157494 (BRACEY STANLEY); | [X]DE3805130 (MITSUBISHI ELECTRIC CORP [JP]); | [X]WO8808203 (XOC DEVICES INC [US]); | [XP]WO8904552 (LSI LOGIC CORP [US]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 30 (E-578)[2877], 28th January 1988; & JP-A-62 188 251 (NEC) 17-08-1987, & JP62188251 A 00000000 |