EP0370767 - Vehicle inner panel [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 17.06.1994 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.06.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.08.1994 [1994/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE AUSTRALIA LTD. 1028-1042 South Road Edwardstown South Australia / AU | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states BRIDGESTONE AUSTRALIA LTD. 1028-1042 South Road Edwardstown South Australia / AU | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Rohrlach, Milo Leslie 28 Balmoral Avenue North Brighton South Australia / AU | 02 /
Hall, William James 32 Euro Avenue Eden Hills South Australia / AU | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al Lloyd Wise Commonwealth House, 1-19 New Oxford Street London WC1A 1LW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/12] | Allam, Peter Clerk, et al LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO. Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | ||
Former [1990/22] | Tregear, George Herbert Benjamin LLOYD WISE, TREGEAR & CO Norman House 105-109 Strand London WC2R 0AE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312077.4 | 21.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | AU19880001605 | 24.11.1988 Original published format: AU 160588 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0370767 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0370767 | Date: | 11.09.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/37] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.07.1991 | Classification | IPC: | B29C67/22, B60R13/02 | [1990/22] | CPC: |
B29C44/16 (EP,US);
B29C45/14 (KR);
B29C44/06 (KR);
B29C44/1257 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [1990/22] | Title | German: | Fahrzeuginnenverkleidung | [1990/22] | English: | Vehicle inner panel | [1990/22] | French: | Panneau interne pour véhicule | [1990/22] | File destroyed: | 15.01.2000 | Examination procedure | 05.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/05] | 09.03.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 29.09.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.02.1994 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1994/32] | 14.03.1994 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1994/32] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1993 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0018951 (MORELLO SERGIO); | [E]EP0361740 (BRIDGESTONE AUSTRALIA [AU]); | [AD]EP0265313 (PEUGEOT [FR], et al); | [A]EP0261760 (SHELLER GLOBE CORP [US]) |