EP0370820 - Bag with resistance to thermal adhesion [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 09.10.1995 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 09.10.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 29.11.1995 [1995/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states POLYPLASTICS CO. LTD. 3-13, Azuchicho, 2-chome Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | For all designated states POLYPLASTICS CO. LTD. 3-13, Azuchicho, 2-chome Chuo-Ku Osaka-shi Osaka 541 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Nedzu, Shigeru 324 Miyashita Fuji-shi Shizuoka / JP | 02 /
Ito, Haruyasu 885-11, Miyajima Fuji-shi Shizuoka / JP | [1990/22] | Representative(s) | Jackson, Peter, et al Barker Brettell 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/22] | Jackson, Peter, et al HYDE, HEIDE & O'DONNELL 10-12 Priests Bridge London SW15 5JE / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312199.6 | 23.11.1989 | [1990/22] | Priority number, date | JP19880297923 | 25.11.1988 Original published format: JP 29792388 | [1990/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0370820 | Date: | 30.05.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/22] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0370820 | Date: | 15.01.1992 | Language: | EN | [1992/03] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 26.11.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C08L23/04, C08J5/18, B65D1/00, // (C08L23/04, :, 67:02) | [1992/03] | CPC: |
C08J5/18 (EP,KR,US);
C08L67/02 (KR);
B29C48/16 (KR);
B32B27/08 (KR);
B32B27/32 (KR);
B32B27/36 (KR);
B65D77/00 (KR);
C08L23/06 (KR);
C08L23/0815 (EP,US);
B32B2439/00 (KR);
C08J2323/04 (EP,US);
C08L2203/16 (KR);
C08L67/00 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1334 (EP,US);
Y10T428/1345 (EP,US);
Y10T428/31797 (EP,US)
(-)
| C-Set: |
C08L23/0815, C08L2666/18 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [1990/22] | C08L23/04, C08J5/18, B65D1/00, // (C08L23/04, 67:02) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/22] | Title | German: | In der Wärme nichtklebriger Sack | [1990/22] | English: | Bag with resistance to thermal adhesion | [1990/22] | French: | Emballage non collant à la chaleur | [1990/22] | File destroyed: | 03.03.2001 | Examination procedure | 13.07.1992 | Examination requested [1992/37] | 29.11.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 11.03.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.05.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 05.05.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 01.06.1995 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1995/48] | 29.06.1995 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [1995/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.09.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.09.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.1994 | 06   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP56013165 ; | [A]JP60180833 ; | [A]DE2926439 (MITSUI PETROCHEMICAL IND); | [A]EP0218355 (MOBIL OIL CORP [US]); | [A]EP0219315 (DOW CHEMICAL CO [US]) | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 81-24128D & JP-A-56 013 165 (TOYOBO), & JP56013165 A 00000000 | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX LATEST Derwent Publications Ltd., London, GB; AN 85-267339 & JP-A-60 180 833 (TORAY), & JP60180833 A 00000000 |