EP0371759 - Intensifier-injector for gaseous fuel for positive displacement engines [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 21.12.1992 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.12.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 10.02.1993 [1993/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF BRITISH COLUMBIA 2075 Westbrook Mall Vancouver British Columbia V6T 1Z1 / CA | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | For all designated states THE UNIVERSITY OF BRITISH COLUMBIA 2075 Wesbrook Mall Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1W5 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hill, Philip G. 2037 Allison Road Vancouver, British Columbia V6T 1T2 / CA | 02 /
Hodgins, K. Bruce 4724 Cannery Crescent Delta, British Columbia V4K 3Y9 / CA | 03 /
Pierik, Ronald J. 5344 Ross Street Vancouver, British Columbia V5W 3K9 / CA | [1990/23] | Representative(s) | Jones, Ian, et al W.P. Thompson & Co. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/23] | Jones, Ian, et al W.P. THOMPSON & CO. Celcon House 289-293 High Holborn London WC1V 7HU / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312355.4 | 29.11.1989 | [1990/23] | Priority number, date | CA19880584496 | 29.11.1988 Original published format: CA 584496 | US19890441104 | 27.11.1989 Original published format: US 441104 | [1990/23] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0371759 | Date: | 06.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/23] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0371759 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | F02M21/02, F02M49/02, F02M43/00 | [1990/23] | CPC: |
F02M57/025 (EP,US);
F02B23/0672 (EP,US);
F02D19/0694 (EP,US);
F02M21/0245 (EP,US);
F02M21/0251 (EP,US);
F02M21/0269 (EP,US);
F02M21/0275 (EP,US);
F02M43/00 (EP,US);
F02M49/02 (EP,US);
F02M59/107 (EP,US);
F02M63/001 (EP,US);
F02M69/045 (EP,US);
F02B2075/125 (EP,US);
F02B23/0621 (EP,US);
F02B23/0663 (EP,US);
F02B23/0669 (EP,US);
F02B23/069 (EP,US);
F02D19/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/23] | Title | German: | Einspritzer-Verdichter für gasförmigen Brennstoff für Verdrängermaschinen | [1990/23] | English: | Intensifier-injector for gaseous fuel for positive displacement engines | [1990/23] | French: | Injecteur-compresseur pour carburant gazeux pour moteurs à déplacement positif | [1990/23] | File destroyed: | 12.06.1999 | Examination procedure | 02.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 03.06.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 10.12.1991 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 30.01.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.08.1992 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1993/06] | 15.09.1992 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [1993/06] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP6013973 ; | [X]BE548434 ; | [Y]BE889978 (SANTORO VITO); | [YD]US4201160 (FENNE IVOR [GB]); | [A]DE731685 (AEROPLANI CAPRONI S A, et al); | [A]FR2211598 (CAV LTD [GB]); | [A]FR1136373 ; | [A]DE3133288 (MASCHF AUGSBURG NUERNBERG AG [DE]) | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN vol. 9, no. 132 (M-385)(1855) 07 June 1985, & JP-A-60 13973 (NIHON DENSHI KIKI) 24 January 1985,, & JP6013973 A 19850124 |