EP0376492 - An optical device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.05.1995 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2009 | Change - representative | published on 18.11.2009 [2009/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1993/28] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states BRITISH TELECOMMUNICATIONS public limited company 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Stanley, Ian William Meadow Barn Tuddenham St Martin Near Ipswich Suffolk IP6 9DA / GB | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A. BT Centre 81 Newgate Street, London EC1A 7AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Intellectual Property Department PP C5A. BT Centre 81 Newgate Street London EC1A 7AJ / GB | ||
Former [1993/50] | Roberts, Simon Christopher, et al BT Group Legal Services Intellectual Property Department 151 Gower Street London WC1E 6BA / GB | ||
Former [1992/38] | Wright, Hugh Ronald Brookes & Martin 52/54 High Holborn London WC1V 6SE / GB | ||
Former [1990/27] | Greenwood, John David British Telecom Intellectual Property Unit 151 Gower Street London WC1E 6BA / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312434.7 | 29.11.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | GB19880027872 | 29.11.1988 Original published format: GB 8827872 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP0376492 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0376492 | Date: | 20.07.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/29] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.04.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/42, G01B11/27, C03C25/00 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
G02B6/4222 (EP,US);
G02B6/42 (KR);
C03C25/1061 (EP,US);
G01B11/272 (EP,US);
G02B6/4203 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, GR, IT, LI, LU, NL, SE [1990/27] | Title | German: | Optisches Element | [1990/27] | English: | An optical device | [1990/27] | French: | Elément optique | [1990/27] | Examination procedure | 02.01.1991 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 15.07.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 19.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 13.04.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 13.05.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 14.01.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.04.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 22.04.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 08.10.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 20.07.1994 | BE | 20.07.1994 | CH | 20.07.1994 | ES | 20.07.1994 | GR | 20.07.1994 | IT | 20.07.1994 | LI | 20.07.1994 | SE | 20.10.1994 | LU | 30.11.1994 | [2002/24] |
Former [2000/04] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
GR | 20.07.1994 | ||
IT | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
LU | 30.11.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
IT | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/29] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
SE | 20.10.1994 | ||
Former [1995/15] | AT | 20.07.1994 | |
BE | 20.07.1994 | ||
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/12] | BE | 20.07.1994 | |
CH | 20.07.1994 | ||
LI | 20.07.1994 | ||
Former [1995/03] | CH | 20.07.1994 | |
LI | 20.07.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP59007312 ; | [A]JP56167115 ; | [A]JP55073011 ; | [A]US4143940 (KHOE GIOK D); | [A]US4334774 (GLASS ALASTAIR M, et al); | [A]US4367952 (AHRENS HARALD [DE], et al); | [Y]FR2535857 (SPECTEC [FR]) | [Y] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 8, no. 92 (P-271)[1529], 27th April 1984; & JP-A-59 007 312 (NIPPON DENKI) 14-01-1984, & JP59007312 A 00000000 | [A] - ELECTRONICS LETTERS, vol. 11, no. 14, 10th July 1975, Stevenhage, Herts, GB; R.B. DYOTT: "Direct coupling from a GaAs laser into a single-mode fibre", pages 308-309 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 6, no. 53 (P-109)[931], 8th April 1982; & JP-A-56 167 115 (FUJITSU) 22-12-1981, & JP56167115 A 00000000 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 4, no. 118 (P-24)[600], 22nd August 1980; & JP-A-55 073 011 (FUJITSU) 02-06-1980, & JP55073011 A 00000000 | Examination | - Taschenbuch der Physik, (1981) Verlag Harri Deutsch, S. 603-607 |