EP0372863 - Patient-controlled analgesia security attachment for a medication infusion system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.1995 Database last updated on 01.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 07.06.1995 [1995/23] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states IVAC CORPORATION 10300 Campus Point Drive San Diego, California 92121-1570 / US | [1994/50] |
Former [1990/24] | For all designated states PACESETTER INFUSION LTD. doing business as MINIMED TECHNOLOGIES 12744 San Fernando Road Sylmar California 91342 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gorton, Lanny A. 10728 Wescott Avenue Sunland CA 91040 / US | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Rees, David Christopher, et al Kilburn & Strode 30 John Street London WC1N 2DD / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312579.9 | 01.12.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | US19880279466 | 02.12.1988 Original published format: US 279466 | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372863 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372863 | Date: | 10.10.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/41] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0372863 | Date: | 15.06.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/24] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.08.1990 | Classification | IPC: | A61M5/142 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
A61M5/142 (EP,US);
A61M2005/1405 (EP,US);
Y10S128/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT, NL, SE [1990/24] | Title | German: | Durch den Patienten kontrollierte Analgesie-Sicherheitsbefestigung für ein Medikamenteninfusionssystem | [1990/24] | English: | Patient-controlled analgesia security attachment for a medication infusion system | [1990/24] | French: | Fixation de sécurité commandée par le patient pour un système de perfusion de médicaments analgésiques | [1990/24] | Examination procedure | 09.04.1991 | Examination requested [1991/24] | 02.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 11.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.08.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 20.12.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.03.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 14.03.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 16.03.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 09.10.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4627839 (YOUNG JOE W [US]); | [A]EP0182502 (DELTEC SYSTEMS INC [US]) |