EP0372868 - Ceramic materials for use in insert-casting and processes for producing the same [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition procedure closed Status updated on 10.10.1997 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.10.1997 | Opposition procedure terminated - date of legal effect published | published on 26.11.1997 [1997/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NGK Insulators, Ltd. 2-56, Suda-Cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City, Aichi Pref. / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | For all designated states NGK INSULATORS, LTD. 2-56, Suda-cho, Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Fukao, Kaname 21-63, Aza-Sagidera Ohaza-Goromaru Inuyama City Aichi pref. / JP | 02 /
Hamanaka, Toshiyuki 682-1, Minamiwakamatsu-cho Suzuka City Mie Pref. / JP | 03 /
Harada, Takashi 32, NGK Kitakazoku Apartments 9,Takeda-cho 3-chome Mizuho-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | 04 /
Kondo, Noboru 7-19-302 Mutsuno 2-chome Atsuta-ku Nagoya City Aichi Pref. / JP | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al Mewburn Ellis LLP City Tower 40 Basinghall Street London EC2V 5DE / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Paget, Hugh Charles Edward, et al MEWBURN ELLIS York House 23 Kingsway London WC2B 6HP / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312586.4 | 01.12.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | JP19880304002 | 02.12.1988 Original published format: JP 30400288 | JP19890038900 | 17.02.1989 Original published format: JP 3890089 | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372868 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372868 | Date: | 24.07.1991 | Language: | EN | [1991/30] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0372868 | Date: | 12.04.1995 | Language: | EN | [1995/15] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.1991 | Classification | IPC: | C04B35/46 | [1990/24] | CPC: |
C04B35/478 (EP,US);
C04B35/111 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | BE, DE, FR, GB, SE [1990/24] | Title | German: | Keramische Stoffe für den Verbundguss und Verfahren zu ihrer Herstellung | [1990/24] | English: | Ceramic materials for use in insert-casting and processes for producing the same | [1990/24] | French: | Matériaux céramiques utilisés dans la coulée pour pièces insérées ainsi que leurs procédés de production | [1990/24] | Examination procedure | 14.08.1991 | Examination requested [1991/42] | 22.09.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.03.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: No) | 27.07.1994 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: later approval) | 27.07.1994 | Fee for grant paid | 27.07.1994 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 10.08.1994 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
12.01.1996
16.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE Hoechst CeramTec AG Wilhelmstrasse 14 D-95100 Selb / DE Opponent's representative Kachholz, Traudel Clariant GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | [1997/10] |
Former [1997/09] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.01.1996
16.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE Hoechst CeramTec AG Wilhelmstrasse 14 D-95100 Selb / DE Opponent's representative Köhler, Ferdinand (DE) Bayer HealthCare AG CAO Law and Patents Patents and Licensing D-51368 Leverkusen / DE | ||
Former [1996/10] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
12.01.1996
16.02.1996
ADMISSIBLE Hoechst CeramTec AG Wilhelmstrasse 14 D-95100 Selb / DE Opponent's representative Kachholz, Traudel Clariant GmbH Patente, Marken, Lizenzen Am Unisys-Park 1 65843 Sulzbach / DE | 21.02.1996 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 01.10.1996 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 09.10.1996 | Communication of observations of patent proprietor (Time limit: M02) | 12.12.1996 | Reply of parties involved to observations of patent proprietor | 02.07.1997 | Despatch of communication that the opposition procedure will be closed | 12.07.1997 | Legal effect of closure of opposition procedure [1997/48] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 18.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 16.12.1994 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | SE | 02.12.1995 | BE | 31.12.1995 | FR | 30.08.1996 | [1997/17] |
Former [1996/52] | SE | 02.12.1995 | |
BE | 31.12.1995 | ||
Former [1996/42] | SE | 02.12.1995 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]JP63129065 ; | [YD]EP0285312 (NGK INSULATORS LTD [JP]); | [Y]FR2402630 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP]); | [YD]US4327188 (ENDO YASUHIKO, et al); | [Y]EP0133021 (CORNING GLASS WORKS [US]); | [A]FR2408557 (ROSENTHAL TECHNIK AG [DE]); | [A]FR2609021 (DIDIER WERKE AG [DE]) | [A] - WORLD PATENTS INDEX (LATEST), accession no. 88-192993, week 28, Derwent Publications Ltd, London, GB; & JP-A-63 129 065 (ASAHI GLASS K.K., JP) 01-06-1988, & JP63129065 A 00000000 |