EP0372894 - Image communication apparatus [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.01.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.11.2007 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state | published on 02.01.2008 [2008/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | For all designated states CANON KABUSHIKI KAISHA 30-2, 3-chome, Shimomaruko, Ohta-ku Tokyo / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Koizumi, Shigeru 10-102, Higashi Takasago-cho 7-chome Urawa-shi Saitama-ken / JP | [1990/24] | Representative(s) | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al Beresford Crump LLP 16 High Holborn London WC1V 6BX / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/24] | Beresford, Keith Denis Lewis, et al BERESFORD & Co. 2-5 Warwick Court High Holborn London WC1R 5DJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312641.7 | 05.12.1989 | [1990/24] | Priority number, date | JP19880308141 | 06.12.1988 Original published format: JP 30814188 | [1990/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0372894 | Date: | 13.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/24] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0372894 | Date: | 22.08.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0372894 | Date: | 09.03.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | H04N1/21, H04N1/32, H04M1/65 | [1994/10] | CPC: |
H04N1/00302 (EP,US);
H04M1/654 (EP,US);
H04N1/00281 (EP,US);
H04N1/32363 (EP,US);
H04N1/32379 (EP,US);
H04N1/32384 (EP,US);
H04N1/32704 (EP,US);
H04N1/3271 (EP,US);
H04N1/32719 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [1990/30] | B65D19/34, B65D19/26, H04N1/21 | ||
Former IPC [1990/24] | H04N1/21 | Designated contracting states | DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, NL [1990/24] | Title | German: | Bildübertragungsvorrichtung | [1990/24] | English: | Image communication apparatus | [1990/24] | French: | Appareil pour la communication d'images | [1990/24] | Examination procedure | 31.12.1990 | Examination requested [1991/10] | 13.04.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 23.10.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 15.06.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.06.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 24.06.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.12.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.12.1990 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.12.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | ES | 09.03.1994 | IT | 09.03.1994 | NL | 09.03.1994 | [2008/01] |
Former [2002/24] | ES | 09.03.1994 | |
IT | 09.03.1994 | ||
NL | 09.03.1994 | ||
Former [1999/42] | IT | 09.03.1994 | |
NL | 09.03.1994 | ||
Former [1995/10] | NL | 09.03.1994 | Documents cited: | Search | [X]JP63088949 ; | [X]JP61242449 ; | [X]US3914539 (HASHIMOTO TAKEMI); | [Y]EP0245904 (PHILIPS NV [NL]) | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 324 (E-653)(3171) 2 September 1988; & JP-A-63 088 949 (SHARP) 20-04-1988, & JP63088949 A 19880902 | [X] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 11, no. (E-491)(2539) 24 March 1987; & JP-A-61 242 449 (MATSUSHITA) 28-10-1986, & JP61242449 A 19870324 |