EP0373894 - Method and apparatus for gray scale printing with a thermal ink jet pen [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 23.03.1995 Database last updated on 24.04.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.08.2008 | Change - applicant | published on 17.09.2008 [2008/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, CA 94304-1112 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/38] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto CA 94304-1112 / US | ||
Former [1991/02] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company Mail Stop 20 B-O, 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto, California 94304 / US | ||
Former [1990/25] | For all designated states Hewlett-Packard Company 3000 Hanover Street Palo Alto California 94304 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dunn, John B.R. 3875 Live Oak Drive Corvllis, OR 97330 / US | [1990/25] | Representative(s) | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 4 St Paul's Churchyard London EC4M 8AY / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/25] | Williams, John Francis, et al WILLIAMS, POWELL & ASSOCIATES 34 Tavistock Street London WC2E 7PB / GB | Application number, filing date | 89312991.6 | 12.12.1989 | [1990/25] | Priority number, date | US19880285836 | 16.12.1988 Original published format: US 285836 | [1990/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0373894 | Date: | 20.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/25] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0373894 | Date: | 27.12.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0373894 | Date: | 18.05.1994 | Language: | EN | [1994/20] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.11.1990 | Classification | IPC: | B41J2/205, B41J2/05 | [1990/45] | CPC: |
B41J2/0458 (EP);
B41J2/04588 (EP);
B41J2/04593 (EP);
B41J2/04598 (EP);
B41J2/2128 (EP);
H04N1/40025 (EP)
|
Former IPC [1990/25] | B41J2/205 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/25] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Gerät zum Drucken von Grauwerten mit einem durch Wärme angetriebenen Tintenstrahl | [1990/25] | English: | Method and apparatus for gray scale printing with a thermal ink jet pen | [1990/25] | French: | Méthode et appareil d'impression d'une échelle de gris avec un stylo thermique à jet d'encre | [1990/25] | Examination procedure | 10.05.1991 | Examination requested [1991/27] | 11.11.1992 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 24.05.1993 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.07.1993 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.09.1993 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 10.11.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 21.02.1995 | No opposition filed within time limit [1995/19] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.11.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.11.1993 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4563689 ; | [Y]EP0205243 ; | [Y]US4463359 ; | [AD]US4490728 | [A] - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN | Examination | - PATENT ABSTRACTS OF JAPAN, vol. 12, no. 381 (M-752)(3228), 12 October 1988; JP-A-63 134249 |