EP0376574 - Franking system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 06.12.1991 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 06.12.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.01.1992 [1992/04] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS LIMITED P.O. Box 3 South Street Romford Essex, RM1 2AR / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1990/27] | For all designated states ALCATEL BUSINESS SYSTEMS LIMITED P.O. Box 3 South Street Romford Essex, RM1 2AR / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abumehdi, Cyrus 114 Copse Hill Harlow Essex CM19 4PR / GB | 02 /
Herbert, Raymond John 34 Sterling Avenue Leigh-on-Sea Essex / GB | [1990/27] | Representative(s) | Loughrey, Richard Vivian Patrick, et al HUGHES CLARK & CO 63 Lincoln's Inn Fields London WC2A 3JU / GB | [1990/27] | Application number, filing date | 89313223.3 | 18.12.1989 | [1990/27] | Priority number, date | GB19880030418 | 30.12.1988 Original published format: GB 8830418 | [1990/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0376574 | Date: | 04.07.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/27] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0376574 | Date: | 28.11.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/48] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.10.1990 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/02 | [1990/27] | CPC: |
G07B17/0008 (EP);
G07B2017/00112 (EP);
G07B2017/00129 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [1990/27] | Title | German: | Frankiersystem | [1990/27] | English: | Franking system | [1990/27] | French: | Système d'affranchissement | [1990/27] | File destroyed: | 15.03.1999 | Examination procedure | 29.05.1991 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [1992/04] | 02.09.1991 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: examination fee not paid in time [1992/04] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]FR2565720 ; | [Y]US4251874 ; | [A]GB2188876 ; | [A]US4138735 ; | [A]US4326254 ; | [A]GB2173741 ; | [A]EP0186881 |