EP0375385 - Scale control [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.1994 Database last updated on 03.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.09.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 02.11.1994 [1994/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states W.R. GRACE & CO.-CONN. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, NY 10036 / US | [N/P] |
Former [1990/26] | For all designated states W.R. Grace & Co.-Conn. Grace Plaza, 1114 Avenue of the Americas New York, New York 10036 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Greaves, Brian 23, Bunbury Drive Runcorn Cheshire, WA7 4AL / GB | [1990/26] | Representative(s) | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [1994/40] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine, et al J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | ||
Former [1990/26] | Ellis-Jones, Patrick George Armine J.A. KEMP & CO. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5LX / GB | Application number, filing date | 89313326.4 | 20.12.1989 | [1990/26] | Priority number, date | GB19880029612 | 20.12.1988 Original published format: GB 8829612 | [1990/26] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP0375385 | Date: | 27.06.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/26] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP0375385 | Date: | 19.09.1990 | Language: | EN | [1990/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP0375385 | Date: | 10.11.1993 | Language: | EN | [1993/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.07.1990 | Classification | IPC: | C02F5/14 | [1990/26] | CPC: |
C02F5/14 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, DE, ES, FR, GB, IT, LI, NL, SE [1990/26] | Title | German: | Kesselsteinverhütung | [1990/26] | English: | Scale control | [1990/26] | French: | Inhibition de tartre | [1990/26] | Examination procedure | 14.03.1991 | Examination requested [1991/19] | 25.11.1991 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M08) | 31.07.1992 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.12.1992 | Despatch of communication of intention to grant (Approval: Yes) | 04.05.1993 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 16.08.1993 | Fee for grant paid | 16.08.1993 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 11.08.1994 | No opposition filed within time limit [1994/44] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.12.1991 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 11.12.1992 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]GB1131738 (PROCTER & GAMBLE); | [Y]US3483178 (CRUTCHFIELD MARVIN M, et al); | [A]DE2325829 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH); | [A]DE2360711 (HENKEL & CIE GMBH); | [X]EP0218798 (BENCKISER KNAPSACK GMBH [DE]) |